Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 05/08/2021 at 09:33:02 (UTC).

CPI/AMHERST SFR PROGRAM II OWNER, LLC VS JANE DOE Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 CPI/AMHERST SFR PROGRAM II OWNER, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against JANE DOE. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FERGUSON, III, EMMET F.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FERGUSON, III, EMMET F.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CPI/AMHERST SFR PROGRAM II OWNER, LLC

4870 N. Hiatus Road

Sunrise, FL 33351

Defendants

JANE DOE

Jacksonville, FL 32244

JOHN DOE

Jacksonville, FL 32244

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DeLuca, Annalise Hayes

3275 W Hillsboro Blvd Ste 312

Deerfield Beach, FL 33442-9474

 

Court Documents

COPY OF MAILED SUMMONS & COMPLAINT RETURNED NOT DELIVERED FOR JOHN DOE

5/3/2021- D17- COPY OF MAILED SUMMONS & COMPLAINT RETURNED NOT DELIVERED FOR JOHN DOE

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER, PLTF, CPUAMHERST SFR PROGRAM II OWNER

4/26/2021- D16- MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER, PLTF, CPUAMHERST SFR PROGRAM II OWNER

ANSWER DEFENDANTS JOHN DOE AND JANE DOE

4/20/2021- D15- ANSWER DEFENDANTS JOHN DOE AND JANE DOE

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UPON JANE DOE ON 4-12-2021@0:7:45PM, POSTED

4/19/2021- D13- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UPON JANE DOE ON 4-12-2021@0:7:45PM, POSTED

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UPON JOHN DOE ON 4-14-2021@0:7:45PM, POSTED

4/19/2021- D12- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UPON JOHN DOE ON 4-14-2021@0:7:45PM, POSTED

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO DEFT. JANE DOE

4/19/2021- D10- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO DEFT. JANE DOE

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO DEFT. JOHN DOE

4/19/2021- D11- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO DEFT. JOHN DOE

CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3863275

4/16/2021- D9- CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3863275

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - JOHN DOE

4/16/2021- D8- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - JOHN DOE

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - JANE DOE

4/16/2021- D7- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - JANE DOE

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR JOHN DOE

4/9/2021- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED FOR JOHN DOE

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR JANE DOE

4/9/2021- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED FOR JANE DOE

COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

4/9/2021- D3- COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

COVER SHEET

4/9/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

CASE FEES PAID: $320.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3855244

4/1/2021- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $320.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3855244

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/4/2021; COPY OF MAILED SUMMONS & COMPLAINT RETURNED NOT DELIVERED FOR JOHN DOE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2021; MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER, PLTF, CPUAMHERST SFR PROGRAM II OWNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/20/2021; ANSWER DEFENDANTS JOHN DOE AND JANE DOE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed : $3.50; Paid : $3.50; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed : $3.50; Paid : $3.50; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/20/2021; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UPON JANE DOE ON 4-12-2021@0:7:45PM, POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/20/2021; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UPON JOHN DOE ON 4-14-2021@0:7:45PM, POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/19/2021; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO DEFT. JANE DOE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/19/2021; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO DEFT. JOHN DOE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/19/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3863275

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/19/2021; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - JANE DOE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS>$2500 3/1/2012; Assessed : $300.00; Paid : $300.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED FOR JOHN DOE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED FOR JANE DOE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; CIVIL COMPLAINT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $320.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3855244

    Read MoreRead Less