This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/25/2023 at 22:01:43 (UTC).

COURTNEY GROVER Et Al VS UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 COURTNEY GROVER filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NORTON, VIRGINIA B.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NORTON, VIRGINIA B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JEFFREY GROVER

COURTNEY GROVER

Defendant

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fouladi, Anthony Amir

Defendant Attorney

Marshall, Dawn

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

2/24/2023- D2- COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

2/24/2023- D3- SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

2/24/2023- D4- COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTF'S FIRST) TO DEFT

2/24/2023- D5- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTF'S FIRST) TO DEFT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF'S FIRST) TO DEFT

2/24/2023- D6- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF'S FIRST) TO DEFT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLTF) TO DEFT

2/24/2023- D7- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLTF) TO DEFT

CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4340597

2/24/2023- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4340597

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ELECTRONIC DELIVERY ON 03/03/2023 TO STEPHEN J DONTGHY FOR UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO

3/3/2023- D9- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ELECTRONIC DELIVERY ON 03/03/2023 TO STEPHEN J DONTGHY FOR UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL DAWN MARSHALL FOR UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

3/16/2023- D10- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL DAWN MARSHALL FOR UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - DEFT

3/23/2023- D11- ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - DEFT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFT'S)

3/23/2023- D12- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFT'S)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT'S)

3/23/2023- D13- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT'S)

REQUEST (DEFT'S) FOR ENTRY UPON LAND TO PLTFS

3/23/2023- D14- REQUEST (DEFT'S) FOR ENTRY UPON LAND TO PLTFS

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (PLTF'S)

3/27/2023- D15- REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (PLTF'S)

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFFS')

4/24/2023- D16- RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFFS')

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S)

4/24/2023- D17- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/25/2023; RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/25/2023; RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFFS')

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/29/2023; REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (PLTF'S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/27/2023; REQUEST (DEFT'S) FOR ENTRY UPON LAND TO PLTFS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/27/2023; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT'S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/27/2023; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFT'S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/27/2023; ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2023; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL DAWN MARSHALL FOR UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/6/2023; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ELECTRONIC DELIVERY ON 03/03/2023 TO STEPHEN J DONTGHY FOR UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialDescription: CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed: $401.00; Paid: $401.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/24/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4340597

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/24/2023; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLTF) TO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/24/2023; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF'S FIRST) TO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/24/2023; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTF'S FIRST) TO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/24/2023; COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/24/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/24/2023; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketEntered: 2/24/2023; CONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less