This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 11/25/2021 at 21:20:06 (UTC).

CONSEIL AND PRIVATE ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC VS JUSTIN MOLOTZAK Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 CONSEIL AND PRIVATE ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against JUSTIN MOLOTZAK. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUTH, JAMES A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUTH, JAMES A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CONSEIL AND PRIVATE ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC

370 Camino Gardens Blvd., Suite 301

Boca Raton, FL 33432

Defendants

JUSTIN MOLOTZAK

Jacksonville, FL 32206

SWAN MOON

Jacksonville, FL 32206

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kelley, Jerron Leon

370 Camino Gardens Blvd Ste 301

Boca Raton, FL 33432-5816

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED NOT SERVED UPON JUSTIN MOLOTZAK AND SWAN MOON ON 11-04-2021@0;2;10PM, UNEXECUTED

11/5/2021- D22- WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED NOT SERVED UPON JUSTIN MOLOTZAK AND SWAN MOON ON 11-04-2021@0;2;10PM, UNEXECUTED

CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4014106

10/21/2021- D21- CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4014106

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

10/21/2021- D20- WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION BOOK 19968 PAGE 2052-2052

10/19/2021- D19- FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION BOOK 19968 PAGE 2052-2052

DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST JUSTIN MOLOTZAK & SWAN MOON

10/13/2021- D18- DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST JUSTIN MOLOTZAK & SWAN MOON

MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUSTIN MOLOTZAK & SWAN MOON OTHER

10/8/2021- D16- MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUSTIN MOLOTZAK & SWAN MOON OTHER

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT JUSTIN MOLOTZAK & SWAN MOON

10/8/2021- D15- MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT JUSTIN MOLOTZAK & SWAN MOON

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT SWAN MOON

10/8/2021- D14- NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT SWAN MOON

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT JUSTIN MOLOTZAK

10/8/2021- D13- NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT JUSTIN MOLOTZAK

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE POST SERVE ON SWAN MOON - SEPT 30 2021 @ 5:05PM

10/8/2021- D12- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE POST SERVE ON SWAN MOON - SEPT 30 2021 @ 5:05PM

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE POST SERVE ON JUSTIN MOLOTZAK - SEPT 30 2021 @ 5:05PM

10/8/2021- D11- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE POST SERVE ON JUSTIN MOLOTZAK - SEPT 30 2021 @ 5:05PM

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DEFENDANT SWAN MOON

9/28/2021- D10- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DEFENDANT SWAN MOON

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DEFENDANT JUSTIN MOLOTZAK

9/28/2021- D9- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DEFENDANT JUSTIN MOLOTZAK

CASE FEES PAID: $212.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3995283

9/28/2021- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $212.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3995283

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING DEFENDANT SWAN MOON

9/27/2021- D7- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING DEFENDANT SWAN MOON

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING DEFENDANT JUSTIN MOLOTZAK

9/27/2021- D6- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING DEFENDANT JUSTIN MOLOTZAK

SUMMONS ISSUED DEFENDANT SWAN MOON

9/27/2021- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED DEFENDANT SWAN MOON

SUMMONS ISSUED DEFENDANT JUSTIN MOLOTZAK

9/27/2021- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED DEFENDANT JUSTIN MOLOTZAK

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/9/2021; WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED NOT SERVED UPON JUSTIN MOLOTZAK AND SWAN MOON ON 11-04-2021@0;2;10PM, UNEXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : WRIT OF POSSESSION; Assessed : $7.00; Paid : $7.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/21/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4014106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/21/2021; WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/20/2021; FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION BOOK 19968 PAGE 2052-2052

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2021; DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST JUSTIN MOLOTZAK & SWAN MOON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/12/2021; MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUSTIN MOLOTZAK & SWAN MOON OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/12/2021; MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT JUSTIN MOLOTZAK & SWAN MOON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/12/2021; NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT SWAN MOON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/12/2021; NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT JUSTIN MOLOTZAK

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2021; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DEFENDANT SWAN MOON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2021; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DEFENDANT JUSTIN MOLOTZAK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $212.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3995283

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2021; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING DEFENDANT SWAN MOON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2021; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING DEFENDANT JUSTIN MOLOTZAK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED DEFENDANT SWAN MOON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED DEFENDANT JUSTIN MOLOTZAK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2021; COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2021; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less