This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/05/2023 at 22:21:29 (UTC).

COLONIAL FOREST OWNER, LLC DBA COLONIAL FOREST APARTMENTS VS JAQUAN JOHNSON

Case Summary

On 11/14/2022 COLONIAL FOREST OWNER, LLC DBA COLONIAL FOREST APARTMENTS filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against JAQUAN JOHNSON. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FLOYD, MOSE L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FLOYD, MOSE L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COLONIAL FOREST OWNER, LLC DBA COLONIAL FOREST APARTMENTS

5928 Firestone Road

Jacksonville, FL 32244

Defendant

JAQUAN JOHNSON

Jacksonville, FL 32244

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cruikshank, Elizabeth Marie

6065 Roswell Rd Ste 680

Atlanta, GA 30328-4011

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

11/14/2022- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

11/14/2022- D3- COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DEFT. JAQUAN JOHNSON

11/14/2022- D4- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DEFT. JAQUAN JOHNSON

SUMMONS ISSUED DEFT. JAQUAN JOHNSON

11/14/2022- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED DEFT. JAQUAN JOHNSON

CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4278963

11/16/2022- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4278963

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED 11/23/22 @ 2:43PM TO JAQUAN JOHNSON - PLAINTIFF

11/28/2022- D7- SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED 11/23/22 @ 2:43PM TO JAQUAN JOHNSON - PLAINTIFF

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT OF DEF

12/13/2022- D8- NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT OF DEF

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) AGAINST JAQUAN JOHNSON

12/13/2022- D9- MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) AGAINST JAQUAN JOHNSON

DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST JAQUAN JOHNSON

12/14/2022- D10- DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST JAQUAN JOHNSON

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/14/2022; DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST JAQUAN JOHNSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/14/2022; MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) AGAINST JAQUAN JOHNSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/14/2022; NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT OF DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/29/2022; SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED 11/23/22 @ 2:43PM TO JAQUAN JOHNSON - PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • FinancialDescription: CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed: $185.00; Paid: $185.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • FinancialDescription: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed: $3.50; Paid: $3.50; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/16/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4278963

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/16/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED DEFT. JAQUAN JOHNSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/16/2022; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DEFT. JAQUAN JOHNSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/16/2022; COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/16/2022; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketEntered: 11/16/2022; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLONIAL FOREST OWNER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELIZABETH CRUIKSHANK