This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/23/2022 at 15:23:02 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER SWANSON Et Al VS GEGEN LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 CHRISTOPHER SWANSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEGEN LLC. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NORTON, VIRGINIA B.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NORTON, VIRGINIA B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHRISTOPHER SWANSON

Jacksonville Beach, FL 32250

MARGARET SWANSON

Jacksonville Beach, FL 32250

Defendants

UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

7821 Bartram Ave

Philedelphia, PA 19153

GEGEN LLC

1701 Walnut St, 7Th Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19103

RAISER-PA LLC

Ct Corporation, 600 N 2Nd St

Harrisburg, PA 17101

RAISER LLC

Ct Corporation, 600 N 2Nd St

Harrisburg, PA 17101

OMAR ADAM

Philadelphia, PA 19149

JYOTI LAMA

Holland, PA 18966

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ford, Parks Campbell

Attorney at Ford, Miller & Wainer, P.A.

1835 3Rd St N

Jacksonville Beach, FL 32250-7469

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

1/20/2022- D2- COVER SHEET

MOTION (EMERGENCY) FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

1/20/2022- D3- MOTION (EMERGENCY) FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

CASE FEES PAID: $403.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4070203

1/20/2022- D4- CASE FEES PAID: $403.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4070203

NOTICE OF HEARING -PLTF ON 01/20/22 @ 215PM VIA ZOOM

1/20/2022- D5- NOTICE OF HEARING -PLTF ON 01/20/22 @ 215PM VIA ZOOM

ORDER ON PLTF EMERGENCY MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

1/27/2022- D6- ORDER ON PLTF EMERGENCY MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2022; ORDER ON PLTF EMERGENCY MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed : $401.00; Paid : $401.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/ADDL DEFENDANT FEE @$2.50ea; Assessed : $2.50; Paid : $2.50; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketEntered: 2/8/2022; AUTO NEGLIGENCE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/21/2022; NOTICE OF HEARING ON 01/20/22 @ 215PM VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/20/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $403.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4070203

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/20/2022; MOTION (EMERGENCY) FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/20/2022; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RAISER-PA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RAISER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ford, Parks Campbell