This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 09/27/2021 at 15:03:03 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER GREGORIO Et Al VS UNITED AIRLINES, INC., A FOREIGN CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/30/2021 CHRISTOPHER GREGORIO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against UNITED AIRLINES, INC , A FOREIGN CORPORATION. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NORTON, VIRGINIA B.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NORTON, VIRGINIA B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STACY GREGORIO

Gainesville, FL 32608

CHRISTOPHER GREGORIO

Gainesville, FL 32608

Defendant

UNITED AIRLINES, INC., A FOREIGN CORPORATION

5200 Sw 91St Terrace, Suite 101

Gainesville, FL 32608

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Sechrest, Michael Dustin

5200 Sw 91St Ter Ste 101

Gainesville, FL 32608-0600

 

Court Documents

CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3983484

9/10/2021- D7- CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3983484

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNITED AIRLINES INC

9/10/2021- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNITED AIRLINES INC

CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3974997

8/30/2021- D4- CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3974997

COMPLAINT

8/30/2021- D3- COMPLAINT

COVER SHEET

8/30/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/13/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3983484

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/13/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNITED AIRLINES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed : $401.00; Paid : $401.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketEntered: 8/31/2021; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/31/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3974997

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/31/2021; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/31/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketEntered: 8/31/2021; OTHER NEGLIGENCE - OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Airlines, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL SECHREST