This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/31/2022 at 00:40:18 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER CHEEKS VS ROSHAWNE CHEEKS

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 CHRISTOPHER CHEEKS filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against ROSHAWNE CHEEKS. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COOPER, WCOLLINS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COOPER, WCOLLINS

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CHRISTOPHER CHEEKS

Jacksonville, FL 32256

Respondent

ROSHAWNE CHEEKS

Jacksonville, FL 32277

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Maurer, Charlean Leann

1835 Eastwest Pkwy Ste 17

Fleming Island, FL 32003-5311

Respondent Attorney

Leombruno, John Philip

3840 Crown Point Rd Ste B

Jacksonville, FL 32257-5991

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR DOMESTIC VIOLENCE INJUNCTION

10/12/2021- D2- PETITION FOR DOMESTIC VIOLENCE INJUNCTION

APPROVED - TEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AND NOTICE OF HEARING

10/13/2021- D9- APPROVED - TEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AND NOTICE OF HEARING

RETURNED SERVED - TEMPORARY INJUNCTION AND NOTICE OF HEARING , UPON ROSHAWNE CHEEKS, FOR C/D OF 10/27/2021

10/19/2021- D12- RETURNED SERVED - TEMPORARY INJUNCTION AND NOTICE OF HEARING , UPON ROSHAWNE CHEEKS, FOR C/D OF 10/27/2021

RETURNED SERVED - TEMPORARY INJUNCTION AND NOTICE OF HEARING --- TEMP APPROVED INJUNCTION --- INDIVIDUALLY SERVED 10/16/2021 AT 12:15PM

10/20/2021- D13- RETURNED SERVED - TEMPORARY INJUNCTION AND NOTICE OF HEARING --- TEMP APPROVED INJUNCTION --- INDIVIDUALLY SERVED 10/16/2021 AT 12:15PM

AMENDED PETITION

10/26/2021- D16- AMENDED PETITION

SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED ON MS. KNIGHT

12/9/2021- D26- SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED ON MS. KNIGHT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2021
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:30 AM; Type : Pending - TEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AND NOTICE OF HEARING; Location : 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 209

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/14/2021; ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/14/2021; ATTY. FOR RESPONDENT: LEOMBRUNO, JOHN PHILIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/14/2021; ATTY. FOR PETITIONER: MAURER, CHARLEAN LEANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/14/2021; CONSENT ORDER ON VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF INJUNCTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/9/2021; SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED ON MS. KNIGHT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/9/2021; SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED ON KRISTEN BECKHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketEntered: 11/18/2021; LETTER TO CHARLEAN MAURER (ATTORNEY FOR THE RESPONDENT; IN RE: LOCATION CHANGE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketEntered: 11/18/2021; LETTER TO PETITIONER (IN RE: LOCATION CHANGE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketEntered: 11/18/2021; LETTER TO RESPONDENT (IN RE: LOCATION CHANGE)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/19/2021; RETURNED SERVED - TEMPORARY INJUNCTION AND NOTICE OF HEARING , UPON ROSHAWNE CHEEKS, FOR C/D OF 10/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2021; APPROVED - TEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AND NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/12/2021; PENDING - TEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AND NOTICE OF HEARING 10/27/2021 8:00 AM - 210 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/12/2021; IDENTIFICATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/12/2021; CHILDREN'S INFORMATION FOR JSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/12/2021; CLERK'S NOTICE OF LINKED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/12/2021; UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION & ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/12/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/12/2021; PETITION FOR DOMESTIC VIOLENCE INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/12/2021; DV - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE INJUNCTION W/CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leombruno, John Philip