This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 01/01/2022 at 15:56:25 (UTC).

CHOICE PLUS LLC VS MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/14/2021 CHOICE PLUS LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER SMITH INCORPORATION. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DEES, ROBERT M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DEES, ROBERT M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHOICE PLUS LLC

855 S Alder Street, Unit B

Burlington, WA 98233

Defendant

MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATION

C/O Its Ra, Ct Corporation System1200 S Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Frazier, William Stafford

Attorney at Law Office of William Frazier PA

1919 Blanding Blvd Ste 8

Jacksonville, FL 32210-3254

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

9/14/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

9/14/2021- D3- COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

SUMMONS ISSUED TO MERRIL, LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATION

9/14/2021- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED TO MERRIL, LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATION

CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3984614

9/14/2021- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3984614

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE (CORP) MERRILL LYNCH PIERCE FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATION ON 9-20-21 @ 2 PM

9/20/2021- D6- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE (CORP) MERRILL LYNCH PIERCE FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATION ON 9-20-21 @ 2 PM

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/21/2021; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE (CORP) MERRILL LYNCH PIERCE FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATION ON 9-20-21 @ 2 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed : $401.00; Paid : $401.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/14/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3984614

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/14/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO MERRIL, LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/14/2021; COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/14/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketEntered: 9/14/2021; CONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Choice Plus LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frazier, William Stafford