This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/06/2022 at 20:20:15 (UTC).

CHERYL JONES VS PETSMART LLC

Case Summary

On 04/26/2022 CHERYL JONES filed an Other lawsuit against PETSMART LLC. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NORTON, VIRGINIA B.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NORTON, VIRGINIA B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHERYL JONES

Jacksonville, FL 32207

Defendant

PETSMART LLC

801 Us Hwy 1

North Palm Beach, FL 33408

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Taylor, Kevin Brandon Jr

1680 Emerson St

Jacksonville, FL 32207-6104

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

4/26/2022- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

4/26/2022- D3- COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PETSMART LLC

4/26/2022- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED TO PETSMART LLC

CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4138627

4/26/2022- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4138627

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON PETSMART LLC ON 5/20/22 AT 10:10AM

6/2/2022- D7- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON PETSMART LLC ON 5/20/22 AT 10:10AM

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES -DEFT

6/7/2022- D8- ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES -DEFT

NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS -DEFT

6/7/2022- D9- NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS -DEFT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFT'S) TO PLTF

6/7/2022- D10- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFT'S) TO PLTF

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT'S) TO PLTF

6/7/2022- D11- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT'S) TO PLTF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFT'S) TO PLTF

6/7/2022- D12- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFT'S) TO PLTF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S)

6/22/2022- D13- RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S)

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S)

6/22/2022- D14- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S)

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S)

6/22/2022- D15- NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S)

MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL - PLTF'S OTHER

6/30/2022- D16- MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL - PLTF'S OTHER

NOTICE OF FILING CONSENT TO WITHDRAWAL - PLTF'S

6/30/2022- D17- NOTICE OF FILING CONSENT TO WITHDRAWAL - PLTF'S

ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL

7/6/2022- D18- ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/7/2022; ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/1/2022; NOTICE OF FILING CONSENT TO WITHDRAWAL - PLTF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/1/2022; MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL - PLTF'S OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/22/2022; NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/22/2022; RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/22/2022; RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/8/2022; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFT'S) TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/8/2022; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT'S) TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/8/2022; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFT'S) TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/8/2022; NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS -DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/8/2022; ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES -DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/2/2022; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON PETSMART LLC ON 5/20/22 AT 10:10AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed : $401.00; Paid : $401.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/26/2022; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/26/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4138627

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/26/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO PETSMART LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/26/2022; COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/26/2022; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/26/2022; OTHER NEGLIGENCE-PREMISES LIABILITY-COMMERCIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC COAST DISTRIBUTING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAYLOR, KEVIN BRANDON JR