This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/21/2022 at 19:34:11 (UTC).

CHERRYWOOD OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC VS CLOMEDIA D HARRIS Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/21/2021 CHERRYWOOD OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CLOMEDIA D HARRIS. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KITE, LONDON M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KITE, LONDON M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHERRYWOOD OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

8777 San Jose Boulevardbuilding A, Suite 200

Jacksonville, FL 32216

Defendants

WILLIAM E HARRIS

Jacksonville, FL 32216

CLOMEDIA D HARRIS

Jacksonville, FL 32216

UNKNOWN TENANT NO 1

Jacksonville, FL 32216

UNKNOWN TENANT NO 2

Jacksonville, FL 32216

DLJ MORTGAGE CAPITAL INC

C/O Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Taube, Rachel Rose

Building A, Suite 2008777 San Jose Blvd

Jacksonville, FL 32217-4213

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

10/21/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT/STATEMENT OF CLAIM/PETITION

10/21/2021- D3- COMPLAINT/STATEMENT OF CLAIM/PETITION

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 19973 PAGE 61-61

10/21/2021- D4- NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 19973 PAGE 61-61

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

10/21/2021- D5- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: WILLIAM E. HARRIS

10/21/2021- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED TO: WILLIAM E. HARRIS

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: CLOMEDIA D. HARRIS

10/21/2021- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED TO: CLOMEDIA D. HARRIS

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: DLJ MORTGAGE CAPITAL, INC.

10/21/2021- D8- SUMMONS ISSUED TO: DLJ MORTGAGE CAPITAL, INC.

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT NO. 1

10/21/2021- D9- SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT NO. 1

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT NO. 2

10/21/2021- D10- SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT NO. 2

CASE FEES PAID: $490.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4014881

10/21/2021- D11- CASE FEES PAID: $490.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4014881

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20028 PAGE 2284-2284

11/23/2021- D12- NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20028 PAGE 2284-2284

RECEIPT NUMBER 4014881 HAD A REFUND OF $140.00 AMOUNT SENT TO CRABTREE LAW GROUP, P.A.

12/21/2021- D15- RECEIPT NUMBER 4014881 HAD A REFUND OF $140.00 AMOUNT SENT TO CRABTREE LAW GROUP, P.A.

CASE FEES PAID: $350.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4014881

12/21/2021- D16- CASE FEES PAID: $350.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4014881

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : REFUNDCHECK; Assessed : $140.00; Paid : $140.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/21/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $350.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4014881

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/21/2021; RECEIPT NUMBER 4014881 HAD A REFUND OF $140.00 AMOUNT SENT TO CRABTREE LAW GROUP, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/21/2021; RECEIPT NUMBER 4014881 REVISED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2021; NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20028 PAGE 2284-2284

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/FORECLOSURE 5/25/2021; Assessed : $300.00; Paid : $300.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/22/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT NO. 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/22/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT NO. 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/22/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO: DLJ MORTGAGE CAPITAL, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/22/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO: CLOMEDIA D. HARRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/22/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO: WILLIAM E. HARRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/22/2021; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/22/2021; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 19973 PAGE 61-61

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/22/2021; COMPLAINT/STATEMENT OF CLAIM/PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/22/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/22/2021; MORTGAGE/LIEN FORECLOSURE - UP TO $15000

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc. by Caliber Home Loans Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Taube, Rachel Rose