This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/15/2023 at 08:15:01 (UTC).

CHAD HANSON Et Al VS KB HOME Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/08/2022 CHAD HANSON filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against KB HOME. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WALLACE, III, WADDELL A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WALLACE, III, WADDELL A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHAD HANSON

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

DEWHYNE HANSON

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

Defendants

KB HOME

C/O Corporation Service Company As Ra, 1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301-2525

KB HOME FLORIDA

C/O Corporation Service Company As Ra, 1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301-2525

KB HOME JACKSONVILLE

C/O Corporation Service Company As Ra, 1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301-2525

3Rd Party Defendant

PEDEL PAINTING, INC.; EXTERIOR PLUS, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

O'Brien, Neil Patrick

777 Alderman Rd

Palm Harbor, FL 34683-2604

Other Attorneys

Sutton, Rouselle Alton III

4767 New Broad St

Orlando, FL 32814-6405

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT (PLAINTIFFS')

12/14/2022- D21- NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT (PLAINTIFFS')

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL

12/7/2022- D20- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON EXTERIOR PLUS INC ON 10/18/22 AT 1:30PM

11/1/2022- D19- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON EXTERIOR PLUS INC ON 10/18/22 AT 1:30PM

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL

10/30/2022- D18- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER WITH REGARD TO SERVICE ON EXTERIORS PLUS, INC.

10/14/2022- D17- ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER WITH REGARD TO SERVICE ON EXTERIORS PLUS, INC.

CASE FEES PAID: $415.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4251719

10/7/2022- D16- CASE FEES PAID: $415.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4251719

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER WITH REGARD TO SERVICE ON EXTERIORS PLUS INC

10/5/2022- D15- MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER WITH REGARD TO SERVICE ON EXTERIORS PLUS INC

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PEDAL PAINTING INC

10/5/2022- D14- SUMMONS ISSUED TO PEDAL PAINTING INC

SUMMONS ISSUED TO EXTERIORS PLUS INC

10/5/2022- D13- SUMMONS ISSUED TO EXTERIORS PLUS INC

ANSWER AND THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT (KB HOME JACKSONVILLE LLC)

10/5/2022- D12- ANSWER AND THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT (KB HOME JACKSONVILLE LLC)

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE (CORPORATION) ON KB HOME JACKSONVILLE, LLC ON SEPT 14, 2022 AT 08:40 AM BY SHEENA BLACK AS AUTHORIZED EMPLOYEE

9/19/2022- D11- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE (CORPORATION) ON KB HOME JACKSONVILLE, LLC ON SEPT 14, 2022 AT 08:40 AM BY SHEENA BLACK AS AUTHORIZED EMPLOYEE

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE (CORPORATION) ON KB HOME FLORIDA, LLC. SEPT 14, 2022 AT 08:40 AM BY SHEENA BLACK AS AUTHORIZED EMPLOYEE

9/19/2022- D10- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE (CORPORATION) ON KB HOME FLORIDA, LLC. SEPT 14, 2022 AT 08:40 AM BY SHEENA BLACK AS AUTHORIZED EMPLOYEE

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE (CORPORATION) ON KB HOME ON SEPT 14, 2022 AT 08:40 AM BY SHEENA BLACK AS AUTHORIZED EMPLOYEE

9/19/2022- D9- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE (CORPORATION) ON KB HOME ON SEPT 14, 2022 AT 08:40 AM BY SHEENA BLACK AS AUTHORIZED EMPLOYEE

CASE FEES PAID: $431.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4232660

9/8/2022- D7- CASE FEES PAID: $431.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4232660

SUMMONS ISSUED TO KB HOME JACKSONVILLE, LLC

9/8/2022- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED TO KB HOME JACKSONVILLE, LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED TO KB HOME FLORIDA, LLC

9/8/2022- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED TO KB HOME FLORIDA, LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED TO KB HOME

9/8/2022- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED TO KB HOME

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

9/8/2022- D3- COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/14/2022; NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT (PLAINTIFFS')

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/7/2022; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/1/2022; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON EXTERIOR PLUS INC ON 10/18/22 AT 1:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/31/2022; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/14/2022; ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER WITH REGARD TO SERVICE ON EXTERIORS PLUS, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • FinancialDescription: CIR/GENCIV/COUNTER/X-CLAIM; Assessed: $395.00; Paid: $395.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/7/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $415.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4251719

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/7/2022; MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER WITH REGARD TO SERVICE ON EXTERIORS PLUS INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2022
  • FinancialDescription: CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed: $401.00; Paid: $401.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketEntered: 9/9/2022; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/9/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $431.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4232660

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/9/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO KB HOME JACKSONVILLE, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/9/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO KB HOME FLORIDA, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/9/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO KB HOME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/9/2022; COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/9/2022; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketEntered: 9/9/2022; OTHER NEGLIGENCE - CONSTRUCTION DEFECT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KB HOME is a litigant

Latest cases where KB HOME FLORIDA LLC is a litigant