This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/14/2022 at 19:29:13 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC VS ANDREA K SALAMEH

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANDREA K SALAMEH. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FLOYD, MOSE L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FLOYD, MOSE L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Po Box 934788

Margate, FL 33093-4788

Defendant

ANDREA K SALAMEH

Jacksonville, FL 32256-2907

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kahn, Jeffrey Lee

Po Box 934788

Margate, FL 33093-4788

Defendant Attorney

Wells, Marilyn Gantt

2064 Park St

Jacksonville, FL 32204-3810

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

11/23/2021- D3- COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

SUMMONS ISSUED - ANDREA SALAMEH

11/23/2021- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED - ANDREA SALAMEH

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

11/23/2021- D5- NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4036612

11/23/2021- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4036612

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UPON ADREA K. SALAMEH ON 12-09-2021@0:5:40PM, PERSONAL

12/10/2021- D7- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UPON ADREA K. SALAMEH ON 12-09-2021@0:5:40PM, PERSONAL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL MARILYN WELLS FOR ANDREA SALAMEH AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK PREVAILING PARTY ATTY. FEES AND NOTICE OF DESIGANTED EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE, FILED UPON DEFENDANT

12/18/2021- D8- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL MARILYN WELLS FOR ANDREA SALAMEH AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK PREVAILING PARTY ATTY. FEES AND NOTICE OF DESIGANTED EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE, FILED UPON DEFENDANT

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFENDANT'S)

12/18/2021- D9- ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFENDANT'S)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/20/2021; ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFENDANT'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/20/2021; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL MARILYN WELLS FOR ANDREA SALAMEH AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK PREVAILING PARTY ATTY. FEES AND NOTICE OF DESIGANTED EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE, FILED UPON DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/10/2021; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UPON ADREA K. SALAMEH ON 12-09-2021@0:5:40PM, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS >$2500 <=$15,000 1/1/2020; Assessed : $300.00; Paid : $300.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4036612

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2021; NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED - ANDREA SALAMEH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2021; COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2021; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $8000 - $15000

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WELLS , MARILYN G