This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/21/2023 at 11:07:51 (UTC).

NORWOOD DAVIS VS DISCOUNT TIRE CO Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/23/2023 NORWOOD DAVIS filed an Other lawsuit against DISCOUNT TIRE CO. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NORTON, VIRGINIA B.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NORTON, VIRGINIA B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORWOOD DAVIS

Defendants

DISCOUNT TIRE CO

HALLE PROPERTIES, L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nooney, Jeffery Scott Jr

Other Attorneys

Tarlow, David Michael

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF NORWOOD DAVIS ON 8/14/23 AT 2:00PM VIA PREVAIL

6/8/2023- D16- NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF NORWOOD DAVIS ON 8/14/23 AT 2:00PM VIA PREVAIL

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S)

5/25/2023- D14- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT DISCOUNT TIRE CO'S FIRST) TO PLAINTIFF

4/20/2023- D11- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT DISCOUNT TIRE CO'S FIRST) TO PLAINTIFF

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT DISCOUNT TIRE CO'S FIRST) TO PLAINTIFF

4/20/2023- D10- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT DISCOUNT TIRE CO'S FIRST) TO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL DAVID TARLOW FOR DISCOUNT TIRE CO AND HALLE PROPERTIES, L.L.C.

4/19/2023- D8- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL DAVID TARLOW FOR DISCOUNT TIRE CO AND HALLE PROPERTIES, L.L.C.

SUMMONS ISSUED TO HALLE PROPERTIES, LLC

3/23/2023- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED TO HALLE PROPERTIES, LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED TO DISCOUNT TIRE CO

3/23/2023- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED TO DISCOUNT TIRE CO

COVER SHEET

3/23/2023- D2- COVER SHEET

CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4370848

3/22/2023- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4370848

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/11/2023; CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION -DEFENDANT'S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/5/2023; NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY -DEFENDANT'S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/21/2023; CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION -DEFENDANT'S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/14/2023; NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION /VIDEO, 08/04/23 @ 2:00PM NORWOOD DAVIS VIA PREVAIL - DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/13/2023; NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - NORWOOD DAVIS 10-26-2023@2PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/7/2023; NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY -DEFENDANT'S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/8/2023; NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF NORWOOD DAVIS ON 8/14/23 AT 2:00PM VIA PREVAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/27/2023; MOTION TO SET FOR TRIAL (PLAINTIFF'S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/27/2023; RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/27/2023; NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2023
  • FinancialDescription: CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed: $401.00; Paid: $401.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/30/2023; ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/30/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED TO HALLE PROPERTIES, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/30/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED TO DISCOUNT TIRE CO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/30/2023; COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/30/2023; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketEntered: 3/30/2023; OTHER NEGLIGENCE-PREMISES LIABILITY-COMMERCIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/30/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4370848

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less