This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/12/2023 at 21:01:23 (UTC).

JILLIAN FISHER Et Al VS INTERNATIONAL STAR REGISTRY OF ILLINOIS LTD

Case Summary

On 04/10/2023 JILLIAN FISHER filed an Other lawsuit against INTERNATIONAL STAR REGISTRY OF ILLINOIS LTD. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DEES, ROBERT M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DEES, ROBERT M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JILLIAN FISHER

JILLIAN FISHER ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARILY SITUATED

Defendant

INTERNATIONAL STAR REGISTRY OF ILLINOIS LTD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hiraldo, Manuel Santiago

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

4/10/2023- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT (CLASS ACTION)

4/10/2023- D3- COMPLAINT (CLASS ACTION)

MOTION (PLTFS) FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION

4/10/2023- D4- MOTION (PLTFS) FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION

SUMMONS ISSUED INTERNATIONAL STAR REGISTRY OF ILLINOIS LTD

4/10/2023- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED INTERNATIONAL STAR REGISTRY OF ILLINOIS LTD

CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4380304

4/10/2023- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4380304

ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES

4/12/2023- D7- ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES

AMENDED ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES

5/15/2023- D8- AMENDED ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/15/2023; AMENDED ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • FinancialDescription: CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed: $401.00; Paid: $401.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/12/2023; ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/12/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4380304

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/12/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED INTERNATIONAL STAR REGISTRY OF ILLINOIS LTD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/12/2023; MOTION (PLTFS) FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/12/2023; COMPLAINT (CLASS ACTION)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/12/2023; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketEntered: 4/12/2023; OTHER NEGLIGENCE - BUSINESS TORTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less