This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/17/2023 at 16:04:40 (UTC).

PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO LLC VS GWENDOLYN BRYANT AKA GWENDALYN BRYANT

Case Summary

On 09/20/2023 PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GWENDOLYN BRYANT AKA GWENDALYN BRYANT. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FELTEL JR, GILBERT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FELTEL JR, GILBERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO LLC

Defendant

GWENDOLYN BRYANT AKA GWENDALYN BRYANT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fisher, Stacey Samantha

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

9/20/2023- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT -AUTO NEGLIGENCE

9/20/2023- D3- COMPLAINT -AUTO NEGLIGENCE

SUMMONS ISSUED GWENDOLYN BRYANT AKA GWENDALYN BRYANT

9/20/2023- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED GWENDOLYN BRYANT AKA GWENDALYN BRYANT

CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4488230

9/21/2023- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4488230

ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES

9/21/2023- D6- ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES

 

Docket Entries

09/21/2023

FinancialDescription: CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed: $401.00; Paid: $401.00; Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023

FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 07/01/2023 (Circuit); Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 9/21/2023; ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 9/21/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4488230

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 9/21/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED GWENDOLYN BRYANT AKA GWENDALYN BRYANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 9/21/2023; COMPLAINT -AUTO NEGLIGENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 9/21/2023; COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketEntered: 9/21/2023; AUTO NEGLIGENCE CASE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less