This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 09/24/2023 at 06:07:50 (UTC).

UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY A/S/O MYESHA ANDRES VS CHRISTOPHER LEE DANE

Case Summary

On 04/26/2023 UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY A/S/O MYESHA ANDRES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER LEE DANE. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HUDSON, DAWN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HUDSON, DAWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY A/S/O MYESHA ANDRES

Defendant

CHRISTOPHER LEE DANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kornfield, Gary Carl

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

4/26/2023- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

4/26/2023- D3- COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED CHRISTOPHER LEE DANE -PLAINTIFF

4/26/2023- D4- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED CHRISTOPHER LEE DANE -PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4391782

4/28/2023- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4391782

SUMMONS ISSUED CHRISTOPHER LEE DANE

4/28/2023- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED CHRISTOPHER LEE DANE

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR CHRISTOPHER LEE DANE

6/2/2023- D8- SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR CHRISTOPHER LEE DANE

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (ALIAS) CHRISTOPHER LEE DANE

7/19/2023- D11- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (ALIAS) CHRISTOPHER LEE DANE

CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4447973

7/20/2023- D12- CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4447973

SUMMONS ISSUED (ALIAS) CHRISTOPHER LEE DANE

7/20/2023- D14- SUMMONS ISSUED (ALIAS) CHRISTOPHER LEE DANE

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 7-31-23 AT 5:19 P.M., (INDIVIDUAL) ON CHRISTOPHER LEE DANE

8/11/2023- D15- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 7-31-23 AT 5:19 P.M., (INDIVIDUAL) ON CHRISTOPHER LEE DANE

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2023
  • HearingTime: 1:30 PM; Type: NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location: Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom: 2379; Cancelled: Yes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • DocketEntered: 8/28/2023; NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING As per AO Cancelling Small Claims Pretrials for Thursday, August 31, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/12/2023; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 7-31-23 AT 5:19 P.M., (INDIVIDUAL) ON CHRISTOPHER LEE DANE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 07/01/2023 (County); Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/20/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED (ALIAS) CHRISTOPHER LEE DANE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • DocketEntered: 7/20/2023; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 08/31/2023 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/20/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4447973

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/20/2023; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (ALIAS) CHRISTOPHER LEE DANE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • HearingTime: 1:30 PM; Type: NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location: Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom: 2379; Cancelled: Yes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketEntered: 6/2/2023; > CANCEL REASON - UNABLE TO PERFECT SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/2/2023; SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR CHRISTOPHER LEE DANE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • FinancialDescription: CO/CLAIMS >$2500 <=$15,000 1/1/2020; Assessed: $300.00; Paid: $300.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/28/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED CHRISTOPHER LEE DANE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketEntered: 4/28/2023; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 06/08/2023 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/28/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4391782

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/28/2023; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED CHRISTOPHER LEE DANE -PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/28/2023; COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/28/2023; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketEntered: 4/28/2023; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $5001 - $8000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less