This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 12/07/2023 at 00:37:47 (UTC).

ALLIANCE FUNDING GROUP VS BELLEVIE AUTO GROUP LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/30/2023 ALLIANCE FUNDING GROUP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BELLEVIE AUTO GROUP LLC. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is AHO, MARIANNE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

AHO, MARIANNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLIANCE FUNDING GROUP

Defendants

BELLEVIE AUTO GROUP LLC

DONALD GILPIN JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zwiebel, Eric Bret

 

Court Documents

CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4474229

8/29/2023- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4474229

COVER SHEET

8/30/2023- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

8/30/2023- D3- COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

SUMMONS ISSUED BELLEVIE AUTO GROUP LLC

8/30/2023- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED BELLEVIE AUTO GROUP LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED DONALD GILPIN JR

8/30/2023- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED DONALD GILPIN JR

ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES

9/1/2023- D7- ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 10/11/2023 11:39AM LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, BELLEVIE AUTO GROUP, LLC

10/13/2023- D8- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 10/11/2023 11:39AM LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, BELLEVIE AUTO GROUP, LLC

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 10/04/2023 11:39AM SUBSTITUTE, BRENDA MILLER FOR DONAL GILPIN JRD

10/13/2023- D9- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 10/04/2023 11:39AM SUBSTITUTE, BRENDA MILLER FOR DONAL GILPIN JRD

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST BELLEVIE AUTO GROUP, LLC AND DONALD GILPIN, JR

10/30/2023- D10- MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST BELLEVIE AUTO GROUP, LLC AND DONALD GILPIN, JR

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT (DEFT. DONALD GILPIN JR)

10/30/2023- D11- NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT (DEFT. DONALD GILPIN JR)

DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST AGAINST BELLEVIE AUTO GROUP, LLC AND DONALD GILPIN, JR

11/1/2023- D12- DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST AGAINST BELLEVIE AUTO GROUP, LLC AND DONALD GILPIN, JR

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT /DEFAULT - PLTF

11/20/2023- D13- MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT /DEFAULT - PLTF

AFFIDAVIT AS TO INDEBTEDNESS - PLTF

11/20/2023- D14- AFFIDAVIT AS TO INDEBTEDNESS - PLTF

AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS - PLTF

11/20/2023- D15- AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS - PLTF

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - PLTF

12/1/2023- D16- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - PLTF

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST BELLEVIE AUTO GROUP, LLC AND DONALD GILPIN, JR

12/1/2023- D17- DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST BELLEVIE AUTO GROUP, LLC AND DONALD GILPIN, JR

LETTER TO JUDGE AHO

12/4/2023- D18- LETTER TO JUDGE AHO

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

12/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 12/4/2023; LETTER TO JUDGE AHO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 12/4/2023; DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST BELLEVIE AUTO GROUP, LLC AND DONALD GILPIN, JR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 12/1/2023; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - PLTF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 11/21/2023; AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS - PLTF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 11/21/2023; AFFIDAVIT AS TO INDEBTEDNESS - PLTF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 11/21/2023; MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT /DEFAULT - PLTF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 11/1/2023; DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST AGAINST BELLEVIE AUTO GROUP, LLC AND DONALD GILPIN, JR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 11/1/2023; NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT (DEFT. DONALD GILPIN JR)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 11/1/2023; MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST BELLEVIE AUTO GROUP, LLC AND DONALD GILPIN, JR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 10/16/2023; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 10/04/2023 11:39AM SUBSTITUTE, BRENDA MILLER FOR DONAL GILPIN JRD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
09/01/2023

FinancialDescription: CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed: $401.00; Paid: $401.00; Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023

FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 07/01/2023 (Circuit); Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023

FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 07/01/2023 (Circuit); Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 9/1/2023; ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 9/1/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED DONALD GILPIN JR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 9/1/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED BELLEVIE AUTO GROUP LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 9/1/2023; COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 9/1/2023; COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023

DocketEntered: 9/1/2023; CONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 9/1/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4474229

[+] Read More [-] Read Less