This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 09/25/2023 at 07:26:24 (UTC).

NORTH CREEK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC., A FLORID VS MARION G. REED Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2023 NORTH CREEK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC , A FLORID filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MARION G REED. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORAN, AUDREY MCKIBBIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORAN, AUDREY MCKIBBIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORTH CREEK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC., A FLORID

Defendants

MARION G. REED

PAMELA J. REED

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

UNKNOWN TENANT #2

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH SECRETARY

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

5/17/2023- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE CLAIM OF LIEN

5/17/2023- D3- COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE CLAIM OF LIEN

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

5/17/2023- D4- NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS ISSUED - MARION G. REED

5/17/2023- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED - MARION G. REED

SUMMONS ISSUED - PAMELA J. REED

5/17/2023- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED - PAMELA J. REED

SUMMONS ISSUED - UNKNOWN TENANT #1

5/17/2023- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED - UNKNOWN TENANT #1

SUMMONS ISSUED - UNKNOWN TENANT #2

5/17/2023- D8- SUMMONS ISSUED - UNKNOWN TENANT #2

SUMMONS ISSUED - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

5/17/2023- D9- SUMMONS ISSUED - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

CASE FEES PAID: $490.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4406516

5/17/2023- D10- CASE FEES PAID: $490.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4406516

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20686 PAGE 2119-2119 RECORDED DOCUMENT

5/23/2023- D11- NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20686 PAGE 2119-2119 RECORDED DOCUMENT

DISCLAIMER (CONDITIONAL) OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

6/21/2023- D12- DISCLAIMER (CONDITIONAL) OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE AND ACCEPTANCE/WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

7/25/2023- D13- NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE AND ACCEPTANCE/WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UPON UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT 5-31-2023 @ 01:00PM

7/25/2023- D14- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UPON UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT 5-31-2023 @ 01:00PM

ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS FOR MARION G. REED

7/25/2023- D15- ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS FOR MARION G. REED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST MARION G REED OTHER

9/5/2023- D16- MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST MARION G REED OTHER

DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST MARION REED

9/7/2023- D17- DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST MARION REED

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/7/2023; DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST MARION REED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/7/2023; MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST MARION G REED OTHER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/28/2023; ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS FOR MARION G. REED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/28/2023; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UPON UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT 5-31-2023 @ 01:00PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/28/2023; NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE AND ACCEPTANCE/WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2023; DISCLAIMER (CONDITIONAL) OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/23/2023; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20686 PAGE 2119-2119 RECORDED DOCUMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialDescription: CO/FORECLOSURE 5/25/2021; Assessed: $440.00; Paid: $440.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/19/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $490.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4406516

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/19/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/19/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED - UNKNOWN TENANT #2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/19/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED - UNKNOWN TENANT #1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/19/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED - PAMELA J. REED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/19/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED - MARION G. REED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/19/2023; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20686 PAGE 2119-2119

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/19/2023; COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE CLAIM OF LIEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/19/2023; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketEntered: 5/19/2023; MORTGAGE/LIEN FORECLOSURE - UP TO $15000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less