This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/04/2023 at 07:03:18 (UTC).

GREG MARKS Et Al VS IKEA PROPERTY, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/21/2023 GREG MARKS filed an Other lawsuit against IKEA PROPERTY, INC. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DEES, ROBERT M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DEES, ROBERT M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GREG MARKS

GREG MARKS AS PARENT AND NATURAL GUARDIAN OF M.M.

Defendant

IKEA PROPERTY, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Schott, Shannon Brooke

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

3/23/2023- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

3/23/2023- D3- COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO IKEA PROPERTY INC

3/23/2023- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED TO IKEA PROPERTY INC

CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4362402

3/23/2023- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4362402

ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES

3/23/2023- D6- ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES

NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

5/8/2023- D7- NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PLTF

8/8/2023- D8- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PLTF

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/8/2023; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/8/2023; AMENDED ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • FinancialDescription: CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed: $401.00; Paid: $401.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/23/2023; ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/23/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4362402

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/23/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED TO IKEA PROPERTY INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/23/2023; COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/23/2023; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketEntered: 3/23/2023; OTHER NEGLIGENCE-PREMISES LIABILITY-COMMERCIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less