This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 10/06/2023 at 22:00:56 (UTC).

HUFFMAN C. VOLENTINE, SAUNDRA DERR Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/08/2023 HUFFMAN C VOLENTINE, SAUNDRA DERR was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BEVERLY, THOMAS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BEVERLY, THOMAS

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SAUNDRA DERR

Decedent

HUFFMAN C. VOLENTINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Oberdorfer, Douglas Aaron

 

Court Documents

CASE FEES PAID: $346.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4484293

9/8/2023- D4- CASE FEES PAID: $346.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4484293

PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADM - INTESTATE

9/8/2023- D2- PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADM - INTESTATE

CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

9/8/2023- D3- CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

 

Docket Entries

10/05/2023

DocketEntered: 10/5/2023; ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION (AMENDED) BOOK 20832 PAGE 1412-1413 RECORDED DOCUMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023

DocketEntered: 10/4/2023; ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION (AMENDED) BOOK 20832 PAGE 1412-1413

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023

DocketEntered: 10/2/2023; ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION BOOK 20826 PAGE 1536-1537 RECORDED DOCUMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketEntered: 9/28/2023; ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketEntered: 9/28/2023; REPRESENTATIVE ATTORNEY: OBERDORFER, DOUGLAS AARON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketEntered: 9/28/2023; PETITIONER: DERR, SAUNDRA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketEntered: 9/28/2023; ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION BOOK 20826 PAGE 1536-1537

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

FinancialDescription: PB/SUM ADMIN-ESTATE >=$1000 7/1/2023; Assessed: $346.00; Paid: $346.00; Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 9/15/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $346.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4484293

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 9/15/2023; CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 9/15/2023; PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADM - INTESTATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

DocketEntered: 9/15/2023; SUMMARY ADMIN-ESTATES VALUED AT $1,000 OR MORE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less