This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 10/12/2023 at 21:13:43 (UTC).

MICHAEL L BELL, NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/14/2023 MICHAEL L BELL, NATIONAL FUNDING, INC was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BEVERLY, THOMAS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BEVERLY, THOMAS

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NATIONAL FUNDING, INC.

Decedent

MICHAEL L BELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Zwiebel, Eric Bret

 

Court Documents

CASE FEES PAID: $42.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4487778

9/14/2023- D3- CASE FEES PAID: $42.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4487778

CAVEAT - CREDITOR

9/14/2023- D2- CAVEAT - CREDITOR

 

Docket Entries

09/20/2023

FinancialDescription: PB/CAVEAT 7/1/2023; Assessed: $42.00; Paid: $0.00; Balance: $42.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

FinancialDescription: PB/CAVEAT 7/1/2023; Assessed: $42.00; Paid: $42.00; Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketEntered: 9/20/2023; ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketEntered: 9/20/2023; REPRESENTATIVE ATTORNEY: ZWIEBEL, ERIC BRET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketEntered: 9/20/2023; PETITIONER: NATIONAL FUNDING, INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 9/20/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $42.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4487778

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 9/20/2023; CAVEAT - CREDITOR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketEntered: 9/20/2023; CAVEAT-CREDITOR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less