This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/26/2023 at 02:03:44 (UTC).

JAMES BEELER II, JAMES C. BEELER Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/20/2023 JAMES BEELER II, JAMES C BEELER was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BEVERLY, THOMAS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BEVERLY, THOMAS

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JAMES BEELER II

Decedent

JAMES CHADWICK BEELER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Oberdorfer, Douglas Aaron

 

Court Documents

CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4489780

9/20/2023- D7- CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4489780

PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION-INTESTATE-FL OTHER

9/20/2023- D2- PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION-INTESTATE-FL OTHER

CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

9/20/2023- D6- CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

10/3/2023- D8- LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

10/3/2023- D9- ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

CASE FEES PAID: $12.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4507323

10/19/2023- D11- CASE FEES PAID: $12.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4507323

 

Docket Entries

10/26/2023

DocketEntered: 10/26/2023; Proof of Publication

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2023

FinancialDescription: Copy/Certification Fee - Probate; Assessed: $12.00; Paid: $12.00; Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 10/19/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $12.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4507323

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023

DocketEntered: 10/5/2023; LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION BOOK 20832 PAGE 1414-1414 RECORDED DOCUMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 10/4/2023; ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 10/4/2023; LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION BOOK 20832 PAGE 1414-1414

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023

FinancialDescription: PB/Formal Admin/Conservatorship 7/1/2023; Assessed: $401.00; Paid: $401.00; Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 9/22/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4489780

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 9/22/2023; CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketEntered: 9/22/2023; WAIVER,CONSENT,WAIVER & BOND

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketEntered: 9/22/2023; WAIVER,CONSENT,WAIVER & BOND

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketEntered: 9/22/2023; OATH AND DESIGNATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 9/22/2023; PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION-INTESTATE-FL OTHER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketEntered: 9/22/2023; FORMAL ADMINISTRATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less