This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/25/2023 at 00:03:00 (UTC).

SAIRA RANGEL VS CARLOS ALFREDO SIERON

Case Summary

On 03/21/2023 SAIRA RANGEL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CARLOS ALFREDO SIERON. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WALLACE, III, WADDELL A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WALLACE, III, WADDELL A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAIRA RANGEL

Defendants

CARLOS ALFREDO SIERON

NFI INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Owens, Donny Allen

Defendant Attorney

Wright, Virgil William III

Other Attorneys

Bannon, Shylie Armon

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OTHER

7/10/2023- D21- MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OTHER

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 07/20/2023 10:40AM

7/26/2023- D27- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 07/20/2023 10:40AM

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES DEF, NFI INTERACTIVE LOGISTICSS, LLC ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

7/18/2023- D24- ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES DEF, NFI INTERACTIVE LOGISTICSS, LLC ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT NFI INTERACTIVE LOGISTCIS, LLC'S) TO PLAINTIFF SAIRA RANGEL

7/5/2023- D20- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT NFI INTERACTIVE LOGISTCIS, LLC'S) TO PLAINTIFF SAIRA RANGEL

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT, NFI INTERACTIVE LOGISTCS, LLC'S) TO PLAINTIFF SAIRA RANGEL

7/5/2023- D19- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT, NFI INTERACTIVE LOGISTCS, LLC'S) TO PLAINTIFF SAIRA RANGEL

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 06/21/2023 12:10PM SERVE CORPORATE PARTNERSHIP, NFI INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC

6/22/2023- D13- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 06/21/2023 12:10PM SERVE CORPORATE PARTNERSHIP, NFI INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS, LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR CARLOS ALFREDO SIERON

6/6/2023- D9- SUMMONS ISSUED FOR CARLOS ALFREDO SIERON

NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

4/11/2023- D6- NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

COVER SHEET

3/21/2023- D2- COVER SHEET

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/19/2023; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES - DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/19/2023; REQUEST TO PRODUCE - DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/19/2023; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/19/2023; ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES -DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/12/2023; NOTICE OF HEARING ON 09/13/2023 @ 03:00PM VIA ZOOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/9/2023; ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFT CARLOS ALFREDO SIERON'S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/27/2023; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 07/20/2023 10:40AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/24/2023; ORDER GRANTING PLTFS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/20/2023; MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS (UNOPPOSED) - PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/19/2023; ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES DEF, NFI INTERACTIVE LOGISTICSS, LLC ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/8/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED FOR CARLOS ALFREDO SIERON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/9/2023; AMENDED ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/14/2023; AMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/14/2023; NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • FinancialDescription: CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed: $401.00; Paid: $401.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/28/2023; ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/28/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4367878

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/28/2023; COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/28/2023; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketEntered: 3/28/2023; AUTO NEGLIGENCE CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less