This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 09/26/2023 at 08:05:58 (UTC).

UNIVERSAL NORTH AMERICA INSURANCE AS SUBROGEE OF JASON HAUSE VS LOWE'S HOME CENTERS LLC

Case Summary

On 05/11/2023 UNIVERSAL NORTH AMERICA INSURANCE AS SUBROGEE OF JASON HAUSE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LOWE'S HOME CENTERS LLC. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FERGUSON, III, EMMET F.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FERGUSON, III, EMMET F.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIVERSAL NORTH AMERICA INSURANCE AS SUBROGEE OF JASON HAUSE

Defendant

LOWE'S HOME CENTERS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Schiller, Bruce Howard

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

5/11/2023- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

5/11/2023- D3- COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

SUMMONS ISSUED LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC

5/11/2023- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC

CASE FEES PAID: $410.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4403712

5/11/2023- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $410.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4403712

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 6/15/23 @ 01:45PM FOR LOWES HOME CENTERS LLC , CORPORATION SHEENA BLACK REGISTERED AGENT

6/21/2023- D6- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 6/15/23 @ 01:45PM FOR LOWES HOME CENTERS LLC , CORPORATION SHEENA BLACK REGISTERED AGENT

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COMPLAINT

6/29/2023- D7- ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

6/29/2023- D8- NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S FIRST) OF DOCUMENTS TO PLAINTIFF, UNIVERSAL NORTH AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY

6/29/2023- D9- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S FIRST) OF DOCUMENTS TO PLAINTIFF, UNIVERSAL NORTH AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT'S FIRST) TO PLAINTIFF, UNIVERSAL NORTH AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY

6/29/2023- D10- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT'S FIRST) TO PLAINTIFF, UNIVERSAL NORTH AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY

Response to Request to Produce

7/27/2023- D11- Response to Request to Produce

Notice of Serving Answers to Interrogatories

7/27/2023- D12- Notice of Serving Answers to Interrogatories

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

9/14/2023- D13- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT

9/14/2023- D14- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/15/2023; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/15/2023; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/27/2023; Notice of Serving Answers to Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/27/2023; Response to Request to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/30/2023; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT'S FIRST) TO PLAINTIFF, UNIVERSAL NORTH AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/30/2023; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S FIRST) OF DOCUMENTS TO PLAINTIFF, UNIVERSAL NORTH AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/30/2023; NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/30/2023; ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/21/2023; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 6/15/23 @ 01:45PM FOR LOWES HOME CENTERS LLC , CORPORATION SHEENA BLACK REGISTERED AGENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • FinancialDescription: CLAIMS >15k <=30k NON FORECLOSURE ACT 1/1/2023; Assessed: $400.00; Paid: $400.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/16/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $410.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4403712

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/16/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/16/2023; COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/16/2023; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketEntered: 5/16/2023; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $15000 - $30000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less