This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 06/16/2022 at 19:21:46 (UTC).

CAREFIRST IMAGING A/A/O TRAVIS GOODRIDGE VS PERMANENT GENERAL ASSURANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/05/2022 CAREFIRST IMAGING A/A/O TRAVIS GOODRIDGE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PERMANENT GENERAL ASSURANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ARIAS, ROBERTO A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ARIAS, ROBERTO A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAREFIRST IMAGING A/A/O TRAVIS GOODRIDGE

Sunrise, FL 33323

Defendant

PERMANENT GENERAL ASSURANCE CORPORATION

P.O. Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Estoy, Faustino Pomposo III

644 Cesery Blvd Ste 330

Jacksonville, FL 32211-3112

 

Court Documents

CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4146424

5/4/2022- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4146424

COVER SHEET , PLAINTIFF

5/5/2022- D2- COVER SHEET , PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED PERMANENT GENERAL CORPORATION

5/5/2022- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED PERMANENT GENERAL CORPORATION

COMPLAINT , PLAINTIFF

5/5/2022- D4- COMPLAINT , PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ISSUED PERMANENT GENERAL ASSURANCE CORPORATION

5/6/2022- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED PERMANENT GENERAL ASSURANCE CORPORATION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS BY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY ON TUESDAY, 05/17/2022 TO PERMANENT GENERAL ASSURANCE CORPORATION FOR RENEE PIERCE

5/24/2022- D7- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS BY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY ON TUESDAY, 05/17/2022 TO PERMANENT GENERAL ASSURANCE CORPORATION FOR RENEE PIERCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/24/2022; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS BY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY ON TUESDAY, 05/17/2022 TO PERMANENT GENERAL ASSURANCE CORPORATION FOR RENEE PIERCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS<$100 3/1/2012; Assessed : $55.00; Paid : $55.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/6/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED PERMANENT GENERAL ASSURANCE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/6/2022; COMPLAINT , PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/6/2022; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED PERMANENT GENERAL CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/6/2022; COVER SHEET , PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/6/2022; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $0 - $100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/6/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4146424

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Permanent General Assurance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Estoy, Faustino Pomposo III