This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 04/23/2022 at 07:40:36 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE AUTO FINANCE VS AARON C BELL Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 CAPITAL ONE AUTO FINANCE filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against AARON C BELL. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FERGUSON, III, EMMET F.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FERGUSON, III, EMMET F.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE AUTO FINANCE

One E Broward Blvd, Suite 1400

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Defendants

SADE D. HUNT

Saint Augustine, FL 32095

AARON C BELL

Jacksonville, FL 32206

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Maskow, Peter James

4960 Conference Way N Ste 100

Boca Raton, FL 33431-3311

Kisz, Amy Benson

10407 Centurion Pkwy N Ste 200

Jacksonville, FL 32256-0544

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE FILED BY DEFENDANT SADE D. HUNT

3/28/2022- D20- RESPONSE FILED BY DEFENDANT SADE D. HUNT

WRIT OF REPLEVIN RETURNED SERVED UPON SADE D. HUNT AND AARON C. BELL ON 03-10-2022210:05AM

3/11/2022- D19- WRIT OF REPLEVIN RETURNED SERVED UPON SADE D. HUNT AND AARON C. BELL ON 03-10-2022210:05AM

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UPON SADIE D. HUNT ON 03-10-2022@10:00AM ,INDIVIDUAL

3/11/2022- D18- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UPON SADIE D. HUNT ON 03-10-2022@10:00AM ,INDIVIDUAL

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UPON AARON C. BELL ON 03-10-2022@10:30AM, INDIVIDUAL

3/11/2022- D17- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UPON AARON C. BELL ON 03-10-2022@10:30AM, INDIVIDUAL

CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4060871

1/4/2022- D16- CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4060871

WRIT OF REPLEVIN ISSUED

1/4/2022- D15- WRIT OF REPLEVIN ISSUED

CASE FEES PAID: $8.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4045294

12/8/2021- D14- CASE FEES PAID: $8.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4045294

ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE A WRIT OF REPLEVIN

12/8/2021- D12- ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE A WRIT OF REPLEVIN

REPLEVIN BOND - (TRUE AND CORRECT COPY)

12/8/2021- D13- REPLEVIN BOND - (TRUE AND CORRECT COPY)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AMY KISZ FOR CAPITAL ONE AUTO FINANCE

11/29/2021- D11- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AMY KISZ FOR CAPITAL ONE AUTO FINANCE

NOTICE OF HEARING TELEPHONIC, FOR 12-08-2021@11:45AM

11/5/2021- D9- NOTICE OF HEARING TELEPHONIC, FOR 12-08-2021@11:45AM

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT SADE HUNT

9/8/2021- D8- NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT SADE HUNT

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AARON BELL

9/8/2021- D7- NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AARON BELL

CASE FEES PAID: $505.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3979668

9/7/2021- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $505.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3979668

COMPLAINT FOR REPEVIN

9/3/2021- D5- COMPLAINT FOR REPEVIN

SUMMONS ISSUED SADE D. HUNT

9/3/2021- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED SADE D. HUNT

SUMMONS ISSUED AARON C. BELL

9/3/2021- D3- SUMMONS ISSUED AARON C. BELL

COVER SHEET

9/3/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/28/2022; RESPONSE FILED BY DEFENDANT SADE D. HUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/15/2022; WRIT OF REPLEVIN RETURNED SERVED UPON SADE D. HUNT AND AARON C. BELL ON 03-10-2022210:05AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/14/2022; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UPON SADIE D. HUNT ON 03-10-2022@10:00AM ,INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/14/2022; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UPON AARON C. BELL ON 03-10-2022@10:30AM, INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : WRIT OF POSSESSION; Assessed : $7.00; Paid : $7.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/5/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4060871

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/5/2022; WRIT OF REPLEVIN ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 11:45 AM; Type : NOTICE OF HEARING; Location : via Telephonic; Courtroom : Remote

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/8/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $8.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4045294

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/8/2021; ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE A WRIT OF REPLEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/9/2021; NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AARON BELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : REPLEVIN > $15,000; Assessed : $485.00; Paid : $485.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/7/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $505.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3979668

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/7/2021; COMPLAINT FOR REPEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/7/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED SADE D. HUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/7/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED AARON C. BELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/7/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketEntered: 9/7/2021; REPLEVIN > $15000 AND

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAPITAL ONE AUTO FINANCE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AMY B KISZ

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MASKOW, PETER