This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 08/02/2022 at 16:04:27 (UTC).

BUREAUS INVESTMENT GROUP PORTFOLIO NO 15 LLC ASSIGNEE OF FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA VS JORGE R MENDEZ

Case Summary

On 12/14/2021 BUREAUS INVESTMENT GROUP PORTFOLIO NO 15 LLC ASSIGNEE OF FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JORGE R MENDEZ. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FLOYD, MOSE L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FLOYD, MOSE L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUREAUS INVESTMENT GROUP PORTFOLIO NO 15 LLC ASSIGNEE OF FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA

100 Second Ave South Suite 306S

Saint Petersburg, FL 33701

Defendant

JORGE R MENDEZ

Jacksonville, FL 32205-9480

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Quiles, Michelle Maria

100 2Nd Ave S Ste 306S

Saint Petersburg, FL 33701-6307

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

12/14/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

12/14/2021- D3- COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED JORGE R MENDEZ -PLAINTIFF

12/14/2021- D4- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED JORGE R MENDEZ -PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4049318

12/15/2021- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4049318

SUMMONS ISSUED JORGE R MENDEZ

12/15/2021- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED JORGE R MENDEZ

RETURN OF NON-SERVICE 01/24/2022 06:05PM NO CONTACT, JORGE R MENDEZ

2/17/2022- D8- RETURN OF NON-SERVICE 01/24/2022 06:05PM NO CONTACT, JORGE R MENDEZ

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketEntered: 2/22/2022; > CANCEL REASON - PLAINTIFF UNABLE TO PERFECT SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketEntered: 2/22/2022; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 2/24/2022 1:30:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/17/2022; RETURN OF NON-SERVICE 01/24/2022 06:05PM NO CONTACT, JORGE R MENDEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS >$2500 <=$15,000 1/1/2020; Assessed : $300.00; Paid : $300.00; Balance : $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/15/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED JORGE R MENDEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/15/2021; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 02/24/2022 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/15/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4049318

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/15/2021; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED JORGE R MENDEZ -PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/15/2021; COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/15/2021; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/15/2021; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $2,501 - $5,000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BUREAUS INVESTMENT GROUP PORTFOLIO NO 15 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Quiles, Michelle Maria