This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 08/17/2022 at 04:21:17 (UTC).

BUREAUS INVESTMENT GROUP PORTFOLIO NO 15 LLC ASSIGNEE OF COMENITY BANK VS EDNA AKRIDGE

Case Summary

On 06/07/2022 BUREAUS INVESTMENT GROUP PORTFOLIO NO 15 LLC ASSIGNEE OF COMENITY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against EDNA AKRIDGE. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANIGAN, ROBIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANIGAN, ROBIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUREAUS INVESTMENT GROUP PORTFOLIO NO 15 LLC ASSIGNEE OF COMENITY BANK

100 Second Ave South Suite 306S

Saint Petersburg, FL 33701

Defendant

EDNA AKRIDGE

Jacksonville, FL 32244-6216

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fornaro, Matthew

11555 Heron Bay Blvd Ste 200

Coral Springs, FL 33076-3362

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

6/7/2022- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

6/7/2022- D3- COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED EDNA AKRIDGE-PLAINTIFF

6/7/2022- D4- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED EDNA AKRIDGE-PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4167024

6/7/2022- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4167024

SUMMONS ISSUED EDNA AKRIDGE

6/8/2022- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED EDNA AKRIDGE

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 07/01/2022 @10:40 AM FOR EDNA AKRIDGE (SUBSTITUTE) CHRISTOPHER LAIGAIE (SPOUSE)

7/1/2022- D8- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 07/01/2022 @10:40 AM FOR EDNA AKRIDGE (SUBSTITUTE) CHRISTOPHER LAIGAIE (SPOUSE)

SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT - DEFENDANT FAILED TO APPEAR; DEFENDANT WAS SERVED; CLERKS DEFAULT WAS ENTERED

7/21/2022- D10- SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT - DEFENDANT FAILED TO APPEAR; DEFENDANT WAS SERVED; CLERKS DEFAULT WAS ENTERED

STIPULATION FOR INSTALLMENT SETTLEMENT - BOTH PARTIES

7/28/2022- D9- STIPULATION FOR INSTALLMENT SETTLEMENT - BOTH PARTIES

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/1/2022; STIPULATION FOR INSTALLMENT SETTLEMENT - BOTH PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/4/2022; DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST - EDNA AKRIDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/4/2022; SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT - DEFENDANT FAILED TO APPEAR; DEFENDANT WAS SERVED; CLERKS DEFAULT WAS ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/2/2022; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 07/01/2022 @10:40 AM FOR EDNA AKRIDGE (SUBSTITUTE) CHRISTOPHER LAIGAIE (SPOUSE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS>$500/=<$2500 3/1/2012; Assessed : $175.00; Paid : $175.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/8/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED EDNA AKRIDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/8/2022; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 07/21/2022 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/8/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4167024

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/8/2022; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED EDNA AKRIDGE-PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/8/2022; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/8/2022; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/8/2022; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $501 - $2,500

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BUREAUS INVESTMENT GROUP PORTFOLIO NO 15 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FORNARO, MATTHEW