This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 12/29/2021 at 19:23:27 (UTC).

BRETZ CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC A/A/O BARBARA ELLIOTT VS ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/01/2021 BRETZ CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC A/A/O BARBARA ELLIOTT filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PEOPLES-WATERS, RHONDA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PEOPLES-WATERS, RHONDA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRETZ CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC A/A/O BARBARA ELLIOTT

Jacksonville, FL 32256

Defendant

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Saben, Adam B

10245 Centurion Pkwy N Ste 305

Jacksonville, FL 32256-0569

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

12/1/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

12/1/2021- D3- COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY-PLAINTIFF

12/1/2021- D4- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY-PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4040921

12/1/2021- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4040921

SUMMONS ISSUED ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

12/1/2021- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS>$500/=<$2500 3/1/2012; Assessed : $175.00; Paid : $175.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4040921

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2021; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY-PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2021; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2021; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $501 - $2,500

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Saben, Adam B