This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 12/27/2022 at 21:02:24 (UTC).

BLANCA PABON VS IKEA PROPERTY, INC

Case Summary

On 12/13/2022 BLANCA PABON filed an Other lawsuit against IKEA PROPERTY, INC. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Anderson Jr, Bruce R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Anderson Jr, Bruce R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BLANCA PABON

Defendant

IKEA PROPERTY, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cooley, Savannah Leigh

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

12/13/2022- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

12/13/2022- D3- COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS ISSUED TO IKEA PROPERTY, INC.

12/13/2022- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED TO IKEA PROPERTY, INC.

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF'S FIRST) TO DEFT

12/13/2022- D5- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF'S FIRST) TO DEFT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT - PLTF

12/13/2022- D6- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT - PLTF

CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4295372

12/13/2022- D7- CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4295372

STANDING ORDER ON POLICIES AND PROCEDURES

12/22/2022- D9- STANDING ORDER ON POLICIES AND PROCEDURES

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/22/2022; STANDING ORDER ON POLICIES AND PROCEDURES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • FinancialDescription: CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed: $401.00; Paid: $401.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/14/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4295372

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/14/2022; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT - PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/14/2022; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF'S FIRST) TO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/14/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO IKEA PROPERTY, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/14/2022; COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/14/2022; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketEntered: 12/14/2022; OTHER NEGLIGENCE-PREMISES LIABILITY-COMMERCIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less