This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 01/03/2022 at 03:13:35 (UTC).

BETTY HOLZENDORF VS HOLZENDORF PROPERTIES, LLP Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/29/2021 BETTY HOLZENDORF filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against HOLZENDORF PROPERTIES, LLP. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WILKINSON, GARY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WILKINSON, GARY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Not Yet Classified

BETTY HOLZENDORF

Jacksonville, FL 32218

HOLZENDORF PROPERTIES, LLC

Defendants

W. W. GAY MECHANICAL CONTRACTOR, INC.

526 Stockton Street

Jacksonville, FL 32204

HOLZENDORF PROPERTIES, LLP

526 Stockton Street

Jacksonville, FL 32204

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Harvey, Terrence Logan

3560 Cardinal Point Dr Ste 202

Jacksonville, FL 32257-9238

Other Attorneys

Holbrook, Henry Leon III

10151 Deerwood Park Blvd Bldg 300

Jacksonville, FL 32256-0566

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT, W.W. GAY MECHANICAL CONTRACTOR INC) TO PLTF FIRST/

9/30/2021- D36- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT, W.W. GAY MECHANICAL CONTRACTOR INC) TO PLTF FIRST/

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT HOLZENDORF PROPERTIES LLP'S) TO PLTFS FIRST/

9/30/2021- D35- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT HOLZENDORF PROPERTIES LLP'S) TO PLTFS FIRST/

RESPONSE (RESPONDENT JAMES MATTHEWS') TO PLTF BETTY HOLZENDORF'S SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

9/27/2021- D34- RESPONSE (RESPONDENT JAMES MATTHEWS') TO PLTF BETTY HOLZENDORF'S SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

RESPONSE (RESPONDENT FLORIDA MECHANICAL SYSTEM INC'S) TO PLTF BETTY HOLZENDORF'S SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

9/27/2021- D33- RESPONSE (RESPONDENT FLORIDA MECHANICAL SYSTEM INC'S) TO PLTF BETTY HOLZENDORF'S SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY -PLTF

8/19/2021- D32- NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY -PLTF

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY -PLTF

8/19/2021- D31- NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY -PLTF

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY -PLTF

8/19/2021- D30- NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY -PLTF

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY -PLTF

8/19/2021- D29- NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY -PLTF

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY -PLTF

8/19/2021- D28- NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY -PLTF

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFT., W.W. GAY MECHANICAL CONTRACTOR

8/19/2021- D27- REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFT., W.W. GAY MECHANICAL CONTRACTOR

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT., W.W. GAY MECHANICAL CONTRACTOR, INC.

8/19/2021- D26- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT., W.W. GAY MECHANICAL CONTRACTOR, INC.

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS PLTF'S FIRST TO DEFT., HOLZENDORF PROPERTIES, LLP

8/19/2021- D25- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS PLTF'S FIRST TO DEFT., HOLZENDORF PROPERTIES, LLP

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES PLTF'S FIRST SET TO DEFT., HOLZENDORF PROPERTIES, LLP

8/19/2021- D24- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES PLTF'S FIRST SET TO DEFT., HOLZENDORF PROPERTIES, LLP

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO DEFTS' REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

8/19/2021- D23- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO DEFTS' REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO DEFTS' REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

8/19/2021- D22- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO DEFTS' REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS BY PLTF

8/6/2021- D21- NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS BY PLTF

NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY PLTF

8/6/2021- D20- NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY PLTF

MOTION TO SET FOR TRIAL -DEFTS

7/27/2021- D18- MOTION TO SET FOR TRIAL -DEFTS

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/30/2021; RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT, W.W. GAY MECHANICAL CONTRACTOR INC) TO PLTF FIRST/

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/30/2021; RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT HOLZENDORF PROPERTIES LLP'S) TO PLTFS FIRST/

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/27/2021; RESPONSE (RESPONDENT JAMES MATTHEWS') TO PLTF BETTY HOLZENDORF'S SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/27/2021; RESPONSE (RESPONDENT FLORIDA MECHANICAL SYSTEM INC'S) TO PLTF BETTY HOLZENDORF'S SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/20/2021; NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY -PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/20/2021; NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY -PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/20/2021; NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY -PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/20/2021; NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY -PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/20/2021; NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY -PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/20/2021; REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFT., W.W. GAY MECHANICAL CONTRACTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed : $401.00; Paid : $401.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketEntered: 6/30/2021; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/30/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3927367

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/30/2021; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS AS TO W.W. GAY MECHANICAL CONTRACTOR INC AND HOLZENDORF PROPERTIES, LLP BOOK 19804 PAGE 756-758

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/30/2021; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketEntered: 6/30/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED FOR HOLZENDORF PROPERTIES, LLP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketEntered: 6/30/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED FOR W.W. GAY MECHANICAL CONTRACTOR INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketEntered: 6/30/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketEntered: 6/30/2021; BUSINESS TRANSACTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where W.W. GAY MECHANICAL CONTRACTOR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Holbrook, Henry Leon III