This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 05/15/2022 at 15:23:16 (UTC).

BARBARA KIRCE Et Al VS ST. JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY, INC

Case Summary

On 01/11/2022 BARBARA KIRCE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ST JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KALIL, MICHELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KALIL, MICHELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THOMAS KIRCE

Orlando, FL 32801

BARBARA KIRCE

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant

ST. JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY, INC

200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32302

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

LaPointe, Douglas John

Cameron Hodges Et Al, 7680 Universal Blvd Ste 440

Orlando, FL 32819-8915

Other Attorneys

Taitt, Winston Ali

424 E Central Blvd # 356

Orlando, FL 32801-1923

Freeman, Sharon Ann

121 S Orange Ave Ste 820N

Orlando, FL 32801-3233

 

Court Documents

NOTICE NOTICE FOR MANDATORY STAY OF PROCEEDING, DEF, ST. JOHNS INS CO

4/13/2022- D22- NOTICE NOTICE FOR MANDATORY STAY OF PROCEEDING, DEF, ST. JOHNS INS CO

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL WINSTON TAITT FOR THOMAS KIRCE AND BARBARA KIRCE AMENDED, DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

4/11/2022- D21- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL WINSTON TAITT FOR THOMAS KIRCE AND BARBARA KIRCE AMENDED, DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF FILING (AMENDED ) ORDER OF LIQUIDATION, INJUNCTION, AND AUTOMATIC AS TO ST. JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY INC.

3/1/2022- D20- NOTICE OF FILING (AMENDED ) ORDER OF LIQUIDATION, INJUNCTION, AND AUTOMATIC AS TO ST. JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY INC.

NOTICE (DEFENDANT'S) OF RECEIVERSHIP/AUTOMATIC STAY

2/25/2022- D19- NOTICE (DEFENDANT'S) OF RECEIVERSHIP/AUTOMATIC STAY

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY / NONAVAILABILITY OF DEFENDANT'S COUNSEL ON 02-28-22 TO 03-18-22

2/21/2022- D18- NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY / NONAVAILABILITY OF DEFENDANT'S COUNSEL ON 02-28-22 TO 03-18-22

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL SHARON FREEMAN FOR THOMAS KIRCE AND BARBARA KIRCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS, FILED ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF

2/17/2022- D17- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL SHARON FREEMAN FOR THOMAS KIRCE AND BARBARA KIRCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS, FILED ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF

OBJECTION (DEFTS.) TO PLANTIFFS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFTS. DESIGNATED CORPORATIVE REPRESENTATIVE

2/9/2022- D16- OBJECTION (DEFTS.) TO PLANTIFFS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFTS. DESIGNATED CORPORATIVE REPRESENTATIVE

MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S, APPRAISAL/ MOTION ABATE PENDING APPRAISAL

2/7/2022- D15- MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S, APPRAISAL/ MOTION ABATE PENDING APPRAISAL

MOTION TO DISMISS FILED ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT

2/7/2022- D14- MOTION TO DISMISS FILED ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM, FOR DEFENDANT'S CORPORATE REPRESNTAIVE VIA ZOOM ON 06-08-2022@0:2:00PM

2/4/2022- D13- NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM, FOR DEFENDANT'S CORPORATE REPRESNTAIVE VIA ZOOM ON 06-08-2022@0:2:00PM

NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

1/20/2022- D12- NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL DOUGLAS LAPOINTE FOR ST. JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY, INC

1/20/2022- D11- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL DOUGLAS LAPOINTE FOR ST. JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY, INC

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PROCESS, FOR ST. JOHN INSURANCE COMPANY C/O HAROLD R. WEAVER ON 01-18-2022 BY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY

1/19/2022- D10- NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PROCESS, FOR ST. JOHN INSURANCE COMPANY C/O HAROLD R. WEAVER ON 01-18-2022 BY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY

CASE FEES PAID: $410.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4065402

1/11/2022- D9- CASE FEES PAID: $410.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4065402

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL WINSTON TAITT FOR THOMAS KIRCE AND BARBARA KIRCE

1/11/2022- D8- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL WINSTON TAITT FOR THOMAS KIRCE AND BARBARA KIRCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLTF) TO DEFTS

1/11/2022- D7- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLTF) TO DEFTS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF) TO DEFTS

1/11/2022- D6- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF) TO DEFTS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTF) TO DEFTS

1/11/2022- D5- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTF) TO DEFTS

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/14/2022; NOTICE NOTICE FOR MANDATORY STAY OF PROCEEDING, DEF, ST. JOHNS INS CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/12/2022; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL WINSTON TAITT FOR THOMAS KIRCE AND BARBARA KIRCE AMENDED, DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2022; NOTICE OF FILING (AMENDED ) ORDER OF LIQUIDATION, INJUNCTION, AND AUTOMATIC AS TO ST. JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/28/2022; NOTICE (DEFENDANT'S) OF RECEIVERSHIP/AUTOMATIC STAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2022; NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY / NONAVAILABILITY OF DEFENDANT'S COUNSEL ON 02-28-22 TO 03-18-22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/18/2022; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL SHARON FREEMAN FOR THOMAS KIRCE AND BARBARA KIRCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS, FILED ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/10/2022; OBJECTION (DEFTS.) TO PLANTIFFS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFTS. DESIGNATED CORPORATIVE REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/8/2022; MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S, APPRAISAL/ MOTION ABATE PENDING APPRAISAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/8/2022; MOTION TO DISMISS FILED ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/7/2022; NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM, FOR DEFENDANT'S CORPORATE REPRESNTAIVE VIA ZOOM ON 06-08-2022@0:2:00PM

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/12/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $410.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4065402

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/12/2022; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL WINSTON TAITT FOR THOMAS KIRCE AND BARBARA KIRCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/12/2022; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLTF) TO DEFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/12/2022; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF) TO DEFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/12/2022; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTF) TO DEFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/12/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED ST JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/12/2022; COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/12/2022; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/12/2022; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $15000 - $30000

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where St Johns Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FREEMAN, SHARON ANN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAITT WINSTON A