This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/31/2022 at 01:14:13 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA VS EVELYN L WHEELER Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/15/2022 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against EVELYN L WHEELER. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA NA

6409 Congress Avenue #100, Suite 100

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendants

EVELYN L WHEELER

Jacksonville, FL 32208

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF EVELYN L WHEELER

Jacksonville, FL 32208

THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

C/O U.S. Attorney Middle District Of Florida, 400 N. Tampa St., Suite 3200

Tampa, FL 33602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Velox, Yahaira

6848 Sw 16Th St

Pembroke Pines, FL 33023-2060

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

6/15/2022- D2- COVER SHEET

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

6/15/2022- D3- VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20326 PAGE 11-13

6/15/2022- D4- NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20326 PAGE 11-13

CERTIFICATE OF NOTE POSSESSION

6/15/2022- D5- CERTIFICATE OF NOTE POSSESSION

COMPLAINT

6/15/2022- D6- COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED EVELYN L. WHEELER

6/15/2022- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED EVELYN L. WHEELER

SUMMONS ISSUED USA ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

6/15/2022- D8- SUMMONS ISSUED USA ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF EVELYN L. WHEELER

6/15/2022- D9- SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF EVELYN L. WHEELER

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/16/2022 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

6/16/2022- D12- CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/16/2022 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

DISCLAIMER ( CONDITIONAL ) OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

6/29/2022- D14- DISCLAIMER ( CONDITIONAL ) OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF EVELYN L WHEELER 06/28/2022 @ 4:55PM

7/5/2022- D15- SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF EVELYN L WHEELER 06/28/2022 @ 4:55PM

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON EVELYN L WHEELER 06/28/2022 @ 4:55PM

7/5/2022- D16- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON EVELYN L WHEELER 06/28/2022 @ 4:55PM

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT 06/21/2022 @ 10:10AM

7/8/2022- D17- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT 06/21/2022 @ 10:10AM

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ON EVELYN L. WHEELER

7/11/2022- D18- NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ON EVELYN L. WHEELER

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : Case Management Conference; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 510

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/11/2022; NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ON EVELYN L. WHEELER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/8/2022; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT 06/21/2022 @ 10:10AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/7/2022; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON EVELYN L WHEELER 06/28/2022 @ 4:55PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/7/2022; SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF EVELYN L WHEELER 06/28/2022 @ 4:55PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/30/2022; DISCLAIMER ( CONDITIONAL ) OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/FORECLOSURE 0-50K 5/25/2021; Assessed : $541.00; Paid : $541.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/16/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $571.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4172888

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/16/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF EVELYN L. WHEELER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/16/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED USA ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/16/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED EVELYN L. WHEELER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/16/2022; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/16/2022; CERTIFICATE OF NOTE POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/16/2022; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20326 PAGE 11-13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/16/2022; VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/16/2022; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/16/2022; HOMESTEAD RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE - $0 - $50,000

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Unite States of America Dept of Treasury is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YAHAIRA VELOX