This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/16/2022 at 01:09:18 (UTC).

ASHLEY STARS VS RYAN STARS

Case Summary

On 03/11/2022 ASHLEY STARS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RYAN STARS. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HORKAN, MAUREEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HORKAN, MAUREEN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ASHLEY STARS

Jacksonville, FL 32246

Respondent

RYAN STARS

Jacksonville, FL 32216

Not Classified By Court

MEDIATOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Tyson, Joshua Christopher

644 Cesery Blvd Ste 250

Jacksonville, FL 32211-3108

Respondent Attorney

Nichols, Eugene Bullard

300 W Adams St Ste 130

Jacksonville, FL 32202-4309

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Leombruno, John Philip

3840 Crown Point Rd Ste B

Jacksonville, FL 32257-5991

 

Court Documents

STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

3/11/2022- D6- STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION & ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT

3/11/2022- D7- UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION & ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT

CASE FEES PAID: $419.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4111166

3/18/2022- D10- CASE FEES PAID: $419.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4111166

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL EUGENE NICHOLS FOR RYAN STARS

4/21/2022- D11- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL EUGENE NICHOLS FOR RYAN STARS

CASE FEES PAID: $295.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4161546

5/31/2022- D18- CASE FEES PAID: $295.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4161546

COVER SHEET

3/11/2022- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH MINOR CHILDREN

3/11/2022- D3- COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH MINOR CHILDREN

NOTICE OF RELATED CASES -NONE

3/11/2022- D5- NOTICE OF RELATED CASES -NONE

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

3/11/2022- D9- NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

SUMMONS ISSUED -RYAN EDWARD STARS

3/18/2022- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED -RYAN EDWARD STARS

ANSWER TO PETITION (HUSBAND'S) FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE - RYAN EDWARD STARDS - ATTRNY

4/21/2022- D12- ANSWER TO PETITION (HUSBAND'S) FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE - RYAN EDWARD STARDS - ATTRNY

REQUEST FOR COMPLIANCE IWTH MANDATORY DISCLOURE RULES TO ASHLEY ELIZABETH STARS FROM RYAN EDWARD STARTS/ATTY

4/26/2022- D13- REQUEST FOR COMPLIANCE IWTH MANDATORY DISCLOURE RULES TO ASHLEY ELIZABETH STARS FROM RYAN EDWARD STARTS/ATTY

NOTICE OF RELATED CASES AND REQUEST FOR COORIDNATION OF LITIGATION/RYAN EDWARD STARS/ATTY

4/26/2022- D14- NOTICE OF RELATED CASES AND REQUEST FOR COORIDNATION OF LITIGATION/RYAN EDWARD STARS/ATTY

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE/RYAN EDWARD STARTS

5/31/2022- D16- NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE/RYAN EDWARD STARTS

COUNTERPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE/RYAN EDWARD STARS/ATTY

5/31/2022- D17- COUNTERPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE/RYAN EDWARD STARS/ATTY

ANSWER TO COUNTERPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGEV- COUNSEL FOR PETITIONER

6/8/2022- D19- ANSWER TO COUNTERPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGEV- COUNSEL FOR PETITIONER

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketEntered: 7/12/2022; ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION JOHN P. LEOMBRUNO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/10/2022; NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 09/01/2022 10:30 AM VIA ZOOM/JOHN P LEOMBRUNO-MEDIATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/9/2022; ANSWER TO COUNTERPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGEV- COUNSEL FOR PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/FAMLAW/COUNTER/X-CLAIM; Assessed : $295.00; Paid : $295.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/31/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $295.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4161546

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/31/2022; COUNTERPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE/RYAN EDWARD STARS/ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/31/2022; NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE/RYAN EDWARD STARTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/9/2022; CFID-CERTIFICATE -RYAN STARS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2022; NOTICE OF RELATED CASES AND REQUEST FOR COORIDNATION OF LITIGATION/RYAN EDWARD STARS/ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2022; REQUEST FOR COMPLIANCE IWTH MANDATORY DISCLOURE RULES TO ASHLEY ELIZABETH STARS FROM RYAN EDWARD STARTS/ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $419.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4111166

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED -RYAN EDWARD STARS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2022; NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2022; NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2022; UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION & ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2022; STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2022; NOTICE OF RELATED CASES -NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2022; COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH MINOR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2022; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2022; DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mediator is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leombruno, John Philip