Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 06/07/2021 at 09:28:01 (UTC).

ASHLEY ` LISBINSKI VS IN RE: TEMPORARY CUSTODY Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 ASHLEY LISBINSKI filed a Family - Minor Custody lawsuit against IN RE TEMPORARY CUSTODY. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEALEY, RUSSELL L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Minor Custody

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEALEY, RUSSELL L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ASHLEY ` LISBINSKI

Atlantic Beach, FL 32233

Respondents

Jeffrey Cunningham

Nolensville, TN 37135

IN RE: TEMPORARY CUSTODY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Harrison, Nancy C

599 Atlantic Blvd Ste 6

Atlantic Beach, FL 32233-4052

Respondent Attorney

Guerrero, Christie

9191 R G Skinner Pkwy Unit 703

Jacksonville, FL 32256-9662

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RELATED CASES -WILLIAMSON COUNTY, TENNESSEE; LEGAL FILE NO. 39415-2021-PPP-1; SOCIAL FILE NO. 66928&66929

5/12/2021- D12- NOTICE OF RELATED CASES -WILLIAMSON COUNTY, TENNESSEE; LEGAL FILE NO. 39415-2021-PPP-1; SOCIAL FILE NO. 66928&66929

MOTION FOR UCCJEA CONFERENCE/ JEFFREY CUNNINGHAM/ ATTY

5/12/2021- D10- MOTION FOR UCCJEA CONFERENCE/ JEFFREY CUNNINGHAM/ ATTY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL CHRISTIE GUERRERO FOR JEFFREY CUNNINGHAM (LIMITED)

5/12/2021- D11- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL CHRISTIE GUERRERO FOR JEFFREY CUNNINGHAM (LIMITED)

SUMMONS ISSUED JEFFREY CUNNINGHAM

4/15/2021- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED JEFFREY CUNNINGHAM

NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

4/15/2021- D5- NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION & ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT / ASHLEY LISBINSKI

4/15/2021- D6- UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION & ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT / ASHLEY LISBINSKI

NOTICE OF RELATED CASES -NONE

4/15/2021- D4- NOTICE OF RELATED CASES -NONE

COVER SHEET

4/15/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT/PETITION (VERIFIED) TO ESTABLISH TEMPORARY EMERGENCY CUSTODY AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED HEARING/ ASHLEY LISBINSKI/ ATTY

4/15/2021- D3- COMPLAINT/PETITION (VERIFIED) TO ESTABLISH TEMPORARY EMERGENCY CUSTODY AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED HEARING/ ASHLEY LISBINSKI/ ATTY

CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3862021

4/16/2021- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3862021

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/13/2021; NOTICE OF RELATED CASES -WILLIAMSON COUNTY, TENNESSEE; LEGAL FILE NO. 39415-2021-PPP-1; SOCIAL FILE NO. 66928&66929

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/13/2021; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL CHRISTIE GUERRERO FOR JEFFREY CUNNINGHAM (LIMITED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/13/2021; MOTION FOR UCCJEA CONFERENCE/ JEFFREY CUNNINGHAM/ ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/6/2021; RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS JEFFREY CUNNINHAM SERVED 04/20/2021 5:20 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/OTHER CIVIL FILING 7/1/2019; Assessed : $401.00; Paid : $401.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3862021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED JEFFREY CUNNINGHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION & ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT / ASHLEY LISBINSKI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; NOTICE OF RELATED CASES -NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; COMPLAINT/PETITION (VERIFIED) TO ESTABLISH TEMPORARY EMERGENCY CUSTODY AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED HEARING/ ASHLEY LISBINSKI/ ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; CUSTODY

    Read MoreRead Less