Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 05/30/2021 at 09:58:00 (UTC).

ARIEL TIPPER VS KENDALL DOUGLAS TIPPER

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 ARIEL TIPPER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KENDALL DOUGLAS TIPPER. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BASS, SUZANNE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BASS, SUZANNE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ARIEL TIPPER

Grovetown, GA 30813

Respondent

KENDALL DOUGLAS TIPPER

Jacksonville, FL 32218

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Boyd, Summer Nicole

Building 200 Suite 250 10151 Deerwood Park Blvd

Jacksonville, FL 32256-0566

Rafuse, Otto Dell

332 E Adams St

Jacksonville, FL 32202-2817

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL OTTO RAFUSE FOR ARIEL TIPPER AND DESIGANTION OF E MAIL ADDRESS

4/28/2021- D9- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL OTTO RAFUSE FOR ARIEL TIPPER AND DESIGANTION OF E MAIL ADDRESS

CASE FEES PAID: $419.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3861834

4/15/2021- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $419.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3861834

STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

4/15/2021- D3- STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/3/2021; ANSWER TO PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH MINOR CHILDRE 0 KENDALL TIPPER / ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/28/2021; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL OTTO RAFUSE FOR ARIEL TIPPER AND DESIGANTION OF E MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/DISSOLUTION MARRIAGE 7/1/2019; Assessed : $409.00; Paid : $409.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $419.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3861834

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED - KENDALL TIPPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION & ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT - SUMMER N. BOYD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; NOTICE OF RELATED CASES - LINKED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH DEPENDENT MINOR CHILDREN - ARIEL TIPPER /

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less