This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/16/2022 at 18:07:26 (UTC).

ANN WAITS Et Al VS OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/09/2022 ANN WAITS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WALLACE, III, WADDELL A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WALLACE, III, WADDELL A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MATTHEW WAITS

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

ANN WAITS

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

Defendant

OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E. Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Montgomery, Daniel S

20 N Orange Ave Ste 1207

Orlando, FL 32801-4657

Other Attorneys

Silvers, Aaron David

1700 Nw 64Th St Ste 460

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309-1801

Schilling, Jeremy Theodore

1700 Nw 64Th St Ste 460

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309-1801

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

6/9/2022- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

6/9/2022- D3- COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

6/9/2022- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED TO OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTFS)

6/9/2022- D5- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTFS)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTFS) TO DEFT

6/9/2022- D6- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTFS) TO DEFT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLTFS) TO DEFT

6/9/2022- D7- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLTFS) TO DEFT

CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

6/9/2022- D8- CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4169370

6/10/2022- D9- CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4169370

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL DANIEL MONTGOMERY FOR OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

7/22/2022- D11- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL DANIEL MONTGOMERY FOR OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME DEF, OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF'S COMPLAINT

7/22/2022- D12- MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME DEF, OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF'S COMPLAINT

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (AGREED) TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

8/10/2022- D13- ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (AGREED) TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/10/2022; ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (AGREED) TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/25/2022; MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME DEF, OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/25/2022; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL DANIEL MONTGOMERY FOR OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed : $401.00; Paid : $401.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/10/2022; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/10/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4169370

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/10/2022; CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/10/2022; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLTFS) TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/10/2022; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTFS) TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/10/2022; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTFS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/10/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/10/2022; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/10/2022; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/10/2022; CONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Olympus Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JEREMY SCHILLING

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SILVERS , AARON