This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 04/10/2023 at 22:22:47 (UTC).

ANN S. STEWART Et Al VS TRUIST BANK F/K/A SUNTRUST BANK

Case Summary

On 07/21/2021 ANN S STEWART filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against TRUIST BANK F/K/A SUNTRUST BANK. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DEARING, KATIE L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DEARING, KATIE L

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CARL M. STEWART

ANN S. STEWART

Defendant

TRUIST BANK F/K/A SUNTRUST BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lake, Christian James

Defendant Attorney

Neilson, Robert Augustine

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

7/21/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

7/21/2021- D3- COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO TRUIST BANK F/K/A SUNTRUST BANK

7/21/2021- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED TO TRUIST BANK F/K/A SUNTRUST BANK

CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3944929

7/22/2021- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3944929

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE (CORP) TRUIST BANK ON 7-28-21 11:30 AM

7/30/2021- D6- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE (CORP) TRUIST BANK ON 7-28-21 11:30 AM

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ROBERT NEILSON FOR TRUIST BANK F/K/A SUNTRUST BANK

8/11/2021- D7- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ROBERT NEILSON FOR TRUIST BANK F/K/A SUNTRUST BANK

NOTICE OF SERVICE PLTF

8/11/2021- D8- NOTICE OF SERVICE PLTF

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (DEFT TRUIST BANK) TO FILE A RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT

9/1/2021- D9- MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (DEFT TRUIST BANK) TO FILE A RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT

STIPULATION (JOINT) TO ARBITRATE CASE AND DISMISSAL OF ACTION

10/1/2021- D10- STIPULATION (JOINT) TO ARBITRATE CASE AND DISMISSAL OF ACTION

ORDER (AGREED) ON JOINT STIP TO ARBITRATE CASE AND FOR DISMISSAL OF ACTION

10/6/2021- D11- ORDER (AGREED) ON JOINT STIP TO ARBITRATE CASE AND FOR DISMISSAL OF ACTION

 

Docket Entries

10/06/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 10/6/2021; ORDER (AGREED) ON JOINT STIP TO ARBITRATE CASE AND FOR DISMISSAL OF ACTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 10/4/2021; STIPULATION (JOINT) TO ARBITRATE CASE AND DISMISSAL OF ACTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 9/1/2021; MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (DEFT TRUIST BANK) TO FILE A RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 8/12/2021; NOTICE OF SERVICE PLTF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 8/11/2021; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ROBERT NEILSON FOR TRUIST BANK F/K/A SUNTRUST BANK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 8/2/2021; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE (CORP) TRUIST BANK ON 7-28-21 11:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/22/2021

FinancialDescription: CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed: $401.00; Paid: $401.00; Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/22/2021

FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/22/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 7/22/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3944929

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 7/22/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO TRUIST BANK F/K/A SUNTRUST BANK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 7/22/2021; COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 7/22/2021; COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2021

DocketEntered: 7/22/2021; ANTITRUST/TRADE REGULATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less