This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/26/2022 at 11:37:33 (UTC).

AMINAH BAHIJAH, ANESSHIA MELVIN Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/21/2021 AMINAH BAHIJAH, ANESSHIA MELVIN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BEVERLY, THOMAS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BEVERLY, THOMAS

 

Party Details

Petitioners

ELLOISE WILSON

Philadelphia, PA 19126

JAX FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

C/O Hiday & Ricke, P.A., Po Box 550858

Jacksonville, FL 32255

Decedent

CARRIE MAE WHITE

Jacksonville, FL 32209

Not Classified By Court

YOLANDA M HUNT

Phildelphia, PA 19150

MICHAEL HUNT

Philadelphia, PA 19126

DONNA V CHRISTY

Philadelphia, PA 19121

WARDELL F GASKIN

Philadelphia, PA 19126

TASHA M BIRCHETT

Brook Haven, PA 19015

TROY HUNT

Philadelphia, PA 19120

AMINAH BAHIJAH

Newark, DE 19702

ANESSHIA MELVIN

Philadelphia, PA 19104

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Frazier, William Stafford

Attorney at Law Office of William Frazier PA

1919 Blanding Blvd Ste 8

Jacksonville, FL 32210-3254

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM -TRUST BANK $17,817.04

5/6/2022- D23- STATEMENT OF CLAIM -TRUST BANK $17,817.04

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS

4/13/2022- D21- PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS

4/13/2022- D20- PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF OBJECTION TO CLAIM

4/4/2022- D18- PROOF OF SERVICE OF OBJECTION TO CLAIM

PROOF OF PUBLICATION - 04/07/22 - 04/14/22

4/14/2022- D22- PROOF OF PUBLICATION - 04/07/22 - 04/14/22

NOTICE TO CREDITORS

4/6/2022- D19- NOTICE TO CREDITORS

OBJECTION TO CLAIM - JAX FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

3/28/2022- D15- OBJECTION TO CLAIM - JAX FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

3/28/2022- D17- LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

3/28/2022- D16- ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - JAX FEDERAL CREDIT UNION $6,314.44

3/24/2022- D14- STATEMENT OF CLAIM - JAX FEDERAL CREDIT UNION $6,314.44

PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD

3/23/2022- D13- PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD

OATH AND DESIGNATION

3/23/2022- D12- OATH AND DESIGNATION

WAIVER,CONSENT,WAIVER & BOND

3/23/2022- D11- WAIVER,CONSENT,WAIVER & BOND

WAIVER,CONSENT,WAIVER & BOND

3/16/2022- D10- WAIVER,CONSENT,WAIVER & BOND

WAIVER,CONSENT,WAIVER & BOND

3/16/2022- D9- WAIVER,CONSENT,WAIVER & BOND

WAIVER,CONSENT,WAIVER & BOND

2/28/2022- D8- WAIVER,CONSENT,WAIVER & BOND

WAIVER,CONSENT,WAIVER & BOND

2/28/2022- D7- WAIVER,CONSENT,WAIVER & BOND

WAIVER,CONSENT,WAIVER & BOND

2/28/2022- D6- WAIVER,CONSENT,WAIVER & BOND

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/19/2022; PROOF OF SERVICE OF OBJECTION TO CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/19/2022; PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/9/2022; OBJECTION TO CLAIM - TRUIST BANK C/O DCM SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/6/2022; STATEMENT OF CLAIM -TRUST BANK $17,817.04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2022; PROOF OF PUBLICATION - 04/07/22 - 04/14/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/13/2022; PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/13/2022; PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/7/2022; NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/5/2022; PROOF OF SERVICE OF OBJECTION TO CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/29/2022; LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION BOOK 20214 PAGE 1888-1888

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2022; WAIVER,CONSENT,WAIVER & BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/28/2022; WAIVER,CONSENT,WAIVER & BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/28/2022; WAIVER,CONSENT,WAIVER & BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/28/2022; WAIVER,CONSENT,WAIVER & BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2022; WAIVER,CONSENT,WAIVER & BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : PB/Formal Admin/Conservatorship 09/04/2018; Assessed : $401.00; Paid : $401.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/21/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4053352

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/21/2021; CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/21/2021; PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION-INTESTATE-FL OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/21/2021; FORMAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JAX FEDERAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frazier, William Stafford