This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/11/2023 at 21:29:26 (UTC).

ALONZO BLAKE VS UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 ALONZO BLAKE filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WALLACE, III, WADDELL A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WALLACE, III, WADDELL A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALONZO BLAKE

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

Defendant

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

1100 West Commercial Blvd.

Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33309

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Smith, Kavon Patrick

777 Alderman Rd

Palm Harbor, FL 34683-2604

Defendant Attorney

Marshall, Dawn

1208 Coastal Bay Blvd

Boynton Beach, FL 33435-7826

 

Court Documents

CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4283643

11/22/2022- D9- CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4283643

COVER SHEET

11/23/2022- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

11/23/2022- D3- COMPLAINT

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

11/23/2022- D4- DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS ISSUED UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

11/23/2022- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTFS FIRST) OF DOCS TO DEFT

11/23/2022- D6- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTFS FIRST) OF DOCS TO DEFT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTFS) TO DEFTS

11/23/2022- D7- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTFS) TO DEFTS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLTFS) OF FIRST/ TO DEFT

11/23/2022- D8- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLTFS) OF FIRST/ TO DEFT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ELECTRONIC DELIIVERY ON 11/30/2022 TO STEPHEN J DONAGHY FOR UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO

11/30/2022- D10- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ELECTRONIC DELIIVERY ON 11/30/2022 TO STEPHEN J DONAGHY FOR UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL DAWN MARSHALL FOR UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

12/8/2022- D11- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL DAWN MARSHALL FOR UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANYS) TO PLTFS COMPLAINT

12/14/2022- D12- ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANYS) TO PLTFS COMPLAINT

AMENDED ANSWER (AMENDED UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO) AND DEFENSES TO PLTF COMPLAINT

12/16/2022- D13- AMENDED ANSWER (AMENDED UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO) AND DEFENSES TO PLTF COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/19/2022; AMENDED ANSWER (AMENDED UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO) AND DEFENSES TO PLTF COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/14/2022; ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANYS) TO PLTFS COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/8/2022; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL DAWN MARSHALL FOR UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/30/2022; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ELECTRONIC DELIIVERY ON 11/30/2022 TO STEPHEN J DONAGHY FOR UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • FinancialDescription: CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed: $401.00; Paid: $401.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2022; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLTFS) OF FIRST/ TO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2022; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTFS) TO DEFTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2022; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTFS FIRST) OF DOCS TO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2022; DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2022; COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2022; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2022; INSURANCE CLAIMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4283643

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marshall, Dawn, ESQ