This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/27/2022 at 07:25:58 (UTC).

ADAM HARRY BRUT JR, DIANNE S BRUT Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 ADAM HARRY BRUT JR, DIANNE S BRUT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHEMER, JACK M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHEMER, JACK M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DIANNE S BRUT

Jacksonville, FL 32223

Decedent

ADAM HARRY BRUT JR

Jacksonville, FL 32223

Interested Parties

SYNOVUS BANK

5801 49Th Street North

St. Petersburg, FL 33709

BRUT PRINTING COMPANY, INC.

503 Parker Street

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Kane, Kevin Andrew

238 Ponte Vedra Park Dr Ste 104

Ponte Vedra Beach, FL 32082-6618

Other Attorneys

Brandt, Judson Clark

Po Box 13010

Pensacola, FL 32591-3010

 

Court Documents

CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3932584

7/7/2021- D7- CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3932584

PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION-TESTATE-FLA.

7/7/2021- D3- PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION-TESTATE-FLA.

ORDER ADMITTING WILL AND APPOINTING P. R.

7/19/2021- D11- ORDER ADMITTING WILL AND APPOINTING P. R.

LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION BOOK 19827 PAGE 1280-1280

7/19/2021- D13- LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION BOOK 19827 PAGE 1280-1280

CASE FEES PAID: $15.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3952724

8/2/2021- D14- CASE FEES PAID: $15.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3952724

PROOF OF PUBLICATION - 7/27/21 - 8/3/21

8/3/2021- D16- PROOF OF PUBLICATION - 7/27/21 - 8/3/21

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL JUDSON BRANDT FOR SYNOVUS BANK AND SYNOVUS BANK

8/31/2021- D17- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL JUDSON BRANDT FOR SYNOVUS BANK AND SYNOVUS BANK

PETITION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME F0R FILING INVENTORY

9/17/2021- D19- PETITION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME F0R FILING INVENTORY

ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR FILING INVENTORY -11/12/21

9/22/2021- D20- ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR FILING INVENTORY -11/12/21

WILL DEPOSITED

7/8/2021- D8- WILL DEPOSITED

LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT BOOK 19827 PAGE 1255-1263

7/19/2021- D12- LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT BOOK 19827 PAGE 1255-1263

STATEMENT OF CLAIM -SYNOVUS BANK $733,212.98

9/14/2021- D18- STATEMENT OF CLAIM -SYNOVUS BANK $733,212.98

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/1/2022; STATEMENT OF CLAIM -BRUT PRINTING COMPANY INC $140,472.28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketEntered: 3/31/2022; SATISFACTION AND RELEASE OF CLAIM (PARTIAL) WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO WACHOVIA BANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2021; PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 11/16/2021; NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketEntered: 11/15/2021; INVENTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/20/2021; STATEMENT OF CLAIM --WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. $18,962.25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/10/2021; AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE BOOK 19950 PAGE 2471-2471

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/23/2021; ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR FILING INVENTORY -11/12/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/20/2021; PETITION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME F0R FILING INVENTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/17/2021; STATEMENT OF CLAIM -SYNOVUS BANK $733,212.98

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketEntered: 7/8/2021; REQUEST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/8/2021; WILL DEPOSITED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : PB/Formal Admin/Conservatorship 09/04/2018; Assessed : $401.00; Paid : $401.00; Balance : $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/7/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3932584

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketEntered: 7/7/2021; NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketEntered: 7/7/2021; NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketEntered: 7/7/2021; OATH AND DESIGNATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/7/2021; PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION-TESTATE-FLA.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketEntered: 7/7/2021; CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketEntered: 7/7/2021; FORMAL ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less