This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 04/10/2023 at 19:17:51 (UTC).

2017-2 IH BORROWER LP VS MACKENZIE COPPOCK

Case Summary

On 03/13/2023 2017-2 IH BORROWER LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MACKENZIE COPPOCK. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANIGAN, ROBIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANIGAN, ROBIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

2017-2 IH BORROWER LP

Defendant

MACKENZIE COPPOCK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Siegel, Matthew Edward

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

3/13/2023- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

3/13/2023- D3- COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED DEFT. MACKENZIE COPPOCK

3/13/2023- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED DEFT. MACKENZIE COPPOCK

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DEFT. MACKENZIE COPPOCK

3/13/2023- D5- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DEFT. MACKENZIE COPPOCK

CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4354496

3/15/2023- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4354496

STIPULATION AND RELEASE OF ANY FUNDS ON DEPOSIT -SIGNED BY BOTH PARTIES

3/21/2023- D7- STIPULATION AND RELEASE OF ANY FUNDS ON DEPOSIT -SIGNED BY BOTH PARTIES

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/23/2023; STIPULATION AND RELEASE OF ANY FUNDS ON DEPOSIT -SIGNED BY BOTH PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • FinancialDescription: CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed: $185.00; Paid: $185.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • FinancialDescription: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed: $3.50; Paid: $3.50; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/15/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4354496

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/15/2023; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DEFT. MACKENZIE COPPOCK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/15/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED DEFT. MACKENZIE COPPOCK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/15/2023; COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/15/2023; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketEntered: 3/15/2023; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (RESIDENTIAL) (NON-MONETARY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less