This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 03/19/2023 at 03:05:03 (UTC).

2017-2 IH BORROWER LP VS CHEMEKA EDWARDS

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 2017-2 IH BORROWER LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CHEMEKA EDWARDS. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ECKLEY-MOULDER, KELLY E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ECKLEY-MOULDER, KELLY E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

2017-2 IH BORROWER LP

Defendant

CHEMEKA EDWARDS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Siegel, Matthew Edward

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISMISSAL

3/16/2023- D23- ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISMISSAL

ORDER AUTHORIZING DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS TO PLAINTIFF

3/16/2023- D22- ORDER AUTHORIZING DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS TO PLAINTIFF

MOTION FOR DISBURSEMENT OF REGISTRY FUNDS (PLAINTIFF'S) STIPULATION SIGNED

3/16/2023- D21- MOTION FOR DISBURSEMENT OF REGISTRY FUNDS (PLAINTIFF'S) STIPULATION SIGNED

MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION - PLAINTIFF

3/16/2023- D20- MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION - PLAINTIFF

STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT - SIGNED BY BOTH PARTIES

3/16/2023- D19- STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT - SIGNED BY BOTH PARTIES

ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT

3/15/2023- D18- ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT

MEMORANDUM TO CASHIER RENT FOR MARCH, 2023 $1785.71 CL. FEE $34.929

3/3/2023- D17- MEMORANDUM TO CASHIER RENT FOR MARCH, 2023 $1785.71 CL. FEE $34.929

CASE FEES PAID: $1,820.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4346538

3/3/2023- D16- CASE FEES PAID: $1,820.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4346538

ORDER TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO THE COURT REGISTRY ($1782.95 ON OR BEFORE 4:00PM 3/3/2023) AND SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL

2/21/2023- D14- ORDER TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO THE COURT REGISTRY ($1782.95 ON OR BEFORE 4:00PM 3/3/2023) AND SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF FILING DEFT. UPDATING PHONE NUMBER

2/17/2023- D13- NOTICE OF FILING DEFT. UPDATING PHONE NUMBER

MEMORANDUM TO CASHIER RENT FOR JAN. & FEB., 2023 $2065.90 CL. FEE $38.49

2/17/2023- D12- MEMORANDUM TO CASHIER RENT FOR JAN. & FEB., 2023 $2065.90 CL. FEE $38.49

CASE FEES PAID: $2,104.39 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4335429

2/17/2023- D11- CASE FEES PAID: $2,104.39 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4335429

ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO DEPOSIT MONIES INTO THE REGISTRY OF THE COURT

2/9/2023- D10- ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO DEPOSIT MONIES INTO THE REGISTRY OF THE COURT

MEMORANDUM TO CASHIER FOR RENT REGISTRY $1500.00 CLERK FEE $30.00

2/8/2023- D9- MEMORANDUM TO CASHIER FOR RENT REGISTRY $1500.00 CLERK FEE $30.00

CASE FEES PAID: $1,530.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4328897

2/8/2023- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $1,530.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4328897

ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT CHEMEKA EDWARDS

2/8/2023- D7- ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT CHEMEKA EDWARDS

CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4322306

1/30/2023- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4322306

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS

1/30/2023- D5- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2023; ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2023; ORDER AUTHORIZING DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2023; MOTION FOR DISBURSEMENT OF REGISTRY FUNDS (PLAINTIFF'S) STIPULATION SIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2023; MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION - PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2023; STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT - SIGNED BY BOTH PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2023; ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • HearingTime: 2:35 PM; Type: NON-JURY TRIAL; Location: (Video Conference); Courtroom: Zoom Session

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • FinancialDescription: CO/REGISTRY/GENCIV; Assessed: $1,820.00; Paid: $1,820.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/3/2023; MEMORANDUM TO CASHIER RENT FOR MARCH, 2023 $1785.71 CL. FEE $34.929

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/3/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $1,820.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4346538

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/8/2023; ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT CHEMEKA EDWARDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • FinancialDescription: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed: $3.50; Paid: $3.50; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • FinancialDescription: CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed: $185.00; Paid: $185.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/30/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4322306

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/30/2023; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS TO CHEMEKA EDWARDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/30/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED TO CHEMEKA EDWARDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/30/2023; COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/30/2023; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/30/2023; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (RESIDENTIAL) (NON-MONETARY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less