This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 10/09/2020 at 15:30:48 (UTC).

ZUHAIR SHAHLY VS NEW BEGINNING AUTO SALES INC.

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 ZUHAIR SHAHLY filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against NEW BEGINNING AUTO SALES INC. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KITE, LONDON M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KITE, LONDON M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZUHAIR SHAHLY

Jacksonville, FL 32256

Defendant

NEW BEGINNING AUTO SALES INC.

5026 Plymouth St. Unit #1

Jacksonville, FL 32205

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO DEFENDANT NEW BEGINNING AUTO SALES INC.

9/25/2020- D5- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO DEFENDANT NEW BEGINNING AUTO SALES INC.

SUMMONS ISSUED NEW BEGINNING AUTO SALES INC.

9/25/2020- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED NEW BEGINNING AUTO SALES INC.

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION (COMERCIAL)

9/25/2020- D3- COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION (COMERCIAL)

COVER SHEET

9/25/2020- D2- COVER SHEET

CASE FEES PAID: $195.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3723758

9/28/2020- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $195.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3723758

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $195.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3723758

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed : $185.00; Paid : $185.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO DEFENDANT NEW BEGINNING AUTO SALES INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED NEW BEGINNING AUTO SALES INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION (COMERCIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less