Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/29/2021 at 02:30:18 (UTC).

YES COMPANIES WFC, LLC D/B/A CHAFFEE PINES VS KALE CARDONA Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2020 YES COMPANIES WFC, LLC D/B/A CHAFFEE PINES filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against KALE CARDONA. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FLOYD, MOSE L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FLOYD, MOSE L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YES COMPANIES WFC, LLC D/B/A CHAFFEE PINES

C/O Fred Elefant, Esquire 1301 Riverplace Boulevard, Suite 1500

Jacksonville, FL 32207

Defendants

VICTORIA CARDONA

Jacksonville, FL 32221

KALE CARDONA

Jacksonville, FL 32221

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION (PLTF, YES COMPANIES WFC, LLC DBA CHAFFEE PINES

3/4/2020- D13- STIPULATION (PLTF, YES COMPANIES WFC, LLC DBA CHAFFEE PINES

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 02/24/2020 12:55APM SERVE, KALE CARDONA

2/26/2020- D12- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 02/24/2020 12:55APM SERVE, KALE CARDONA

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 02/24/2020 12:55PM SUBSTITUTE, KALE CARDONA FOR VICTORIA CARDONA

2/26/2020- D11- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 02/24/2020 12:55PM SUBSTITUTE, KALE CARDONA FOR VICTORIA CARDONA

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS ENTERED UPON VICTORIA CARDONA

2/20/2020- D10- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS ENTERED UPON VICTORIA CARDONA

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS ENTERED UPON KALE CARDONA

2/20/2020- D9- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS ENTERED UPON KALE CARDONA

CASE FEES PAID: $212.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3617999

2/20/2020- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $212.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3617999

SUMMONS ISSUED VICTORIA CARDONA

2/19/2020- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED VICTORIA CARDONA

SUMMONS ISSUED KALE CARDONA

2/19/2020- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED KALE CARDONA

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR VICTORIA CARDONA

2/19/2020- D4- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR VICTORIA CARDONA

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR KALE CARDONA

2/19/2020- D3- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR KALE CARDONA

COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

2/19/2020- D2- COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S (CIVIL)

2/19/2020- D1- COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S (CIVIL)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/4/2020; STIPULATION (PLTF, YES COMPANIES WFC, LLC DBA CHAFFEE PINES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/26/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 02/24/2020 12:55APM SERVE, KALE CARDONA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/26/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 02/24/2020 12:55PM SUBSTITUTE, KALE CARDONA FOR VICTORIA CARDONA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed : $3.50; Paid : $3.50; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed : $185.00; Paid : $185.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed : $3.50; Paid : $3.50; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS ENTERED UPON VICTORIA CARDONA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS ENTERED UPON KALE CARDONA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $212.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3617999

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED VICTORIA CARDONA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED KALE CARDONA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR VICTORIA CARDONA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR KALE CARDONA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S (CIVIL)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YES COMPANIES WFC, LLC D/B/A CHAFFEE PINES is a litigant