This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 08/01/2020 at 16:32:51 (UTC).

WRH REALTY SERVICES INC FOR CIEL APTS VS SERGIO VALLE

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 WRH REALTY SERVICES INC FOR CIEL APTS filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against SERGIO VALLE. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORAN, JOHN A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORAN, JOHN A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WRH REALTY SERVICES INC FOR CIEL APTS

C/O Dale G. Westling, Sr., Esquire 331 E Union St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendant

SERGIO VALLE

Jacksonville, FL 32246

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Westling, Dale Gregory

331 Union St E Ste 2A

Jacksonville, FL 32202-2795

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE :PLAINTIFF

3/11/2020- D8- NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE :PLAINTIFF

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS ENTERED UPON SERGIO VALLE

2/14/2020- D7- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS ENTERED UPON SERGIO VALLE

COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

2/12/2020- D4- COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

SUMMONS ISSUED SERGIO VALLE

2/12/2020- D3- SUMMONS ISSUED SERGIO VALLE

COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S (CIVIL)

2/12/2020- D1- COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S (CIVIL)

CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3614913

2/14/2020- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3614913

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING SERGIO VALLE

2/12/2020- D2- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING SERGIO VALLE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/11/2020; NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE :PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed : $185.00; Paid : $185.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed : $3.50; Paid : $3.50; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS ENTERED UPON SERGIO VALLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3614913

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED SERGIO VALLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING SERGIO VALLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S (CIVIL)

    Read MoreRead Less