This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 08/12/2020 at 03:21:41 (UTC).

WRH REALTY SERVICES INC FOR CIEL APTS VS ROBYN BATESON Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 WRH REALTY SERVICES INC FOR CIEL APTS filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against ROBYN BATESON. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KALIL, MICHELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KALIL, MICHELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WRH REALTY SERVICES INC FOR CIEL APTS

C/O Dale G. Westling, Sr., Esquire 331 E Union St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendants

ROBYN BATESON

Jacksonville, FL 32246

TYLER RIDENHOUR

Jacksonville, FL 32246

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Westling, Dale Gregory

331 Union St E Ste 2A

Jacksonville, FL 32202-2795

 

Court Documents

ORDER TEMPORARILY STAYING EVICTIONS FOR NON-PAYMENT AND REQUIRING FURTHER PLEADING FROM PLAINTIFF

4/16/2020- D15- ORDER TEMPORARILY STAYING EVICTIONS FOR NON-PAYMENT AND REQUIRING FURTHER PLEADING FROM PLAINTIFF

COPY OF MAILED SUMMONS & COMPLAINT RETURNED NOT DELIVERED FOR DEFT., TYLER RIDENHOUR

3/20/2020- D14- COPY OF MAILED SUMMONS & COMPLAINT RETURNED NOT DELIVERED FOR DEFT., TYLER RIDENHOUR

COPY OF MAILED SUMMONS & COMPLAINT RETURNED NOT DELIVERED FOR ROBIN BATESON

3/9/2020- D13- COPY OF MAILED SUMMONS & COMPLAINT RETURNED NOT DELIVERED FOR ROBIN BATESON

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED 02/19/2020 04:20PM NONSERVE., TYLER RIDENHOUR

2/24/2020- D12- SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED 02/19/2020 04:20PM NONSERVE., TYLER RIDENHOUR

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED 02/19/2020 04:20PM NON SERVE, ROBYN BATESON

2/24/2020- D11- SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED 02/19/2020 04:20PM NON SERVE, ROBYN BATESON

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS TYLER RIDENHOUR

2/14/2020- D10- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS TYLER RIDENHOUR

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS ROBYN BATESON

2/14/2020- D9- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS ROBYN BATESON

COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

2/12/2020- D6- COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

SUMMONS ISSUED TYLER IDENHOUR

2/12/2020- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED TYLER IDENHOUR

SUMMONS ISSUED ROBYN BATESON

2/12/2020- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED ROBYN BATESON

COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S (CIVIL)

2/12/2020- D1- COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S (CIVIL)

CASE FEES PAID: $212.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3614850

2/14/2020- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $212.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3614850

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TYLER RIDENHOUR

2/12/2020- D3- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TYLER RIDENHOUR

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING ROBYN BATESON

2/12/2020- D2- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING ROBYN BATESON

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/17/2020; ORDER TEMPORARILY STAYING EVICTIONS FOR NON-PAYMENT AND REQUIRING FURTHER PLEADING FROM PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/25/2020; COPY OF MAILED SUMMONS & COMPLAINT RETURNED NOT DELIVERED FOR DEFT., TYLER RIDENHOUR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/10/2020; COPY OF MAILED SUMMONS & COMPLAINT RETURNED NOT DELIVERED FOR ROBIN BATESON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED 02/19/2020 04:20PM NONSERVE., TYLER RIDENHOUR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED 02/19/2020 04:20PM NON SERVE, ROBYN BATESON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed : $3.50; Paid : $3.50; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed : $185.00; Paid : $185.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed : $3.50; Paid : $3.50; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS TYLER RIDENHOUR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS ROBYN BATESON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $212.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3614850

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TYLER IDENHOUR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED ROBYN BATESON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TYLER RIDENHOUR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING ROBYN BATESON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S (CIVIL)

    Read MoreRead Less