Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 01/28/2021 at 19:42:58 (UTC).

Wilmington Savings Fund Society Fsb Not In Its Individual Capacity, But Solely As Owner Trustee For Csmc 2018-Rpl6 Trust VS HAWKS POINTE OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/28/2020 Wilmington Savings Fund Society Fsb Not In Its Individual Capacity, But Solely As Owner Trustee For Csmc 2018-Rpl6 Trust filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against HAWKS POINTE OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wilmington Savings Fund Society Fsb Not In Its Individual Capacity, But Solely As Owner Trustee For Csmc 2018-Rpl6 Trust

1031 North Miami Beach Boulevard

North Miami Beach, FL 33162

Defendants

JONATHAN M. STEWART

Jacksonville, FL 32222

Unknown Tenant # 1

Jacksonville, FL 32222

Unknown Tenant # 2

Jacksonville, FL 32222

Unknown Spouse Of Lori M. Stewart

Jacksonville, FL 32222

HAWKS POINTE OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

C/O Linda K. Melton 1008-120 Park Avenue

Orange Park, FL 32073

Unknown Spouse Of Jonathan M. Stewart

Jacksonville, FL 32222

LORI M. STEWART

Jacksonville, FL 32222

All Unknown Heirs, Beneficiaries, Legatees, Devisees, Personal Representatives, Creditors And Any Other Person Claiming By, Through, Under Or Against Jonathan M. Stewart, Decd

Guardian Ad Litem

Gal

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rosenfeld, Tara Lauren

1031 N Miami Beach Blvd

North Miami Beach, FL 33162-3842

Guardian Ad Litem Attorney

Kite-Powell, Julia Bliton

Po Box 18645

Tampa, FL 33679-8645

 

Court Documents

FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED FOR 02/25/21 9AM - CR 510 // REMARKS: GAL APPTD

12/17/2020- D56- FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED FOR 02/25/21 9AM - CR 510 // REMARKS: GAL APPTD

CASE MANAGEMENT RESCHEDULE 02/25/2021 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202 (PER COURT CALENDAR 12/15/2020)

12/15/2020- D55- CASE MANAGEMENT RESCHEDULE 02/25/2021 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202 (PER COURT CALENDAR 12/15/2020)

UNABLE TO ISSUE DEFAULT FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JONATHAN M. STEWART, DECEASED - NAME IS NOT ON THE PROOF OF PUBLICATION

12/10/2020- D54- UNABLE TO ISSUE DEFAULT FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JONATHAN M. STEWART, DECEASED - NAME IS NOT ON THE PROOF OF PUBLICATION

MOTION FOR DEFAULT ; UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JONATHAN M. STEWART, DECEASED OTHER

12/9/2020- D52- MOTION FOR DEFAULT ; UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JONATHAN M. STEWART, DECEASED OTHER

NOTICE OF ACTION - ISSUED FOR ALL UNKNOWN HEIRS, BENEFICIARIES, LEGATEES, DEVISEES, PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVES, CREDITORS AND ANY OTHER PERSON CLAIMING BY, THROUGH, UNDER OR AGAINST JONATHAN M. STEWART, DECEASED; UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JONATHAN M. STEWART, DECEASED

11/4/2020- D49- NOTICE OF ACTION - ISSUED FOR ALL UNKNOWN HEIRS, BENEFICIARIES, LEGATEES, DEVISEES, PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVES, CREDITORS AND ANY OTHER PERSON CLAIMING BY, THROUGH, UNDER OR AGAINST JONATHAN M. STEWART, DECEASED; UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JONATHAN M. STEWART, DECEASED

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

11/3/2020- D51- AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3748619

11/3/2020- D48- CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3748619

CASE FEES PAID: $12.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3731087

10/6/2020- D42- CASE FEES PAID: $12.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3731087

DEFAULT AGAINST LORI M. STEWART AND HAWKS POINTE OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC.

9/21/2020- D40- DEFAULT AGAINST LORI M. STEWART AND HAWKS POINTE OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC.

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY -UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LORI STEWART, UNKNOWN TENANT #1, UNKNOWN TENANT #2

9/18/2020- D39- NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY -UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LORI STEWART, UNKNOWN TENANT #1, UNKNOWN TENANT #2

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

9/18/2020- D38- MOTION FOR DEFAULT

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ; HAWKS POINTE OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC. ON 3/16/2020 @ 12:01 PM

9/17/2020- D36- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ; HAWKS POINTE OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC. ON 3/16/2020 @ 12:01 PM

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ; LORI M. STEWART ON 3/19/2020 @ 3:35 PM

4/6/2020- D25- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ; LORI M. STEWART ON 3/19/2020 @ 3:35 PM

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LORI M STEWART 03/18/2020

4/2/2020- D18- RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LORI M STEWART 03/18/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED ; LORI M. STEWART

2/28/2020- D8- SUMMONS ISSUED ; LORI M. STEWART

CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE 05/05/2020 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

3/3/2020- D16- CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE 05/05/2020 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

2/28/2020- D5- VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 19126 PAGE 1789-1790

2/28/2020- D2- NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 19126 PAGE 1789-1790

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2021
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : Case Management Reschedule; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 510

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketEntered: 1/20/2021; MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT (PLAINTIFF'S SECOND VERIFIED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketEntered: 1/11/2021; MOTION FOR DISCHARGE AND REPORT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketEntered: 12/31/2020; ANSWER TO VERIFIED AMENDED COMPLAINT BY GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketEntered: 12/31/2020; DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketEntered: 12/23/2020; ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR DEFT, ALL UNK HEIRS, BENEFICIARIES, LEGATEES, DEVISEES, PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVES, CREDITORS AND ANY OTHER PERSON CLAIMING BY, THROUGH, UNDER OR AGAINST STANLEY DAVID JORDAN, DECEASED -GRANTED. JULIA B. KITE-POWELL, ESQ. IS APPOINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketEntered: 12/18/2020; ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR/GUARDIAN/ATTYAD LITEM - JULIA B. KITE-POWELL, ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/17/2020; FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED FOR 02/25/21 9AM - CR 510 // REMARKS: GAL APPTD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : Case Management Reschedule; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 510

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/16/2020; CASE MANAGEMENT RESCHEDULE 02/25/2021 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202 (PER COURT CALENDAR 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/3/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED ; UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LORI M. STEWART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/3/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED ; UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JONATHAN M. STEWART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/3/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED ; LORI M. STEWART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/3/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED ; JONATHAN M. STEWART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/3/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED ; HAWKS POINTE OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/3/2020; VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/3/2020; CERTIFICATE OF PHYSICAL POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/3/2020; COMPLAINT (VERIFIED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/3/2020; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 19126 PAGE 1789-1790

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/3/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gal is a litigant

Latest cases where Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JULIA B KITE-POWELL