This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/29/2021 at 04:01:18 (UTC).

WHEELER CHIROPRACTIC A/A/O LAUREN BISHOP VS PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/23/2020 WHEELER CHIROPRACTIC A/A/O LAUREN BISHOP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SADLER, KIMBERLY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SADLER, KIMBERLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WHEELER CHIROPRACTIC A/A/O LAUREN BISHOP

St Augustine, FL 32085

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

600 North Westshore Blvd Ste 500

Tampa, FL 33609

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Owens, Donald Ray III

Po Box 3747

Saint Augustine, FL 32085-3747

Defendant Attorney

Crawford, Robyn Kelli

390 N Orange Ave Ste 2100

Orlando, FL 32801-1642

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (PLAINTIFF'S)

5/6/2020- D16- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (PLAINTIFF'S)

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

4/27/2020- D12- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ROBYN CRAWFORD FOR PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

4/6/2020- D11- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ROBYN CRAWFORD FOR PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS ISSUED PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

2/25/2020- D10- SUMMONS ISSUED PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3621728

2/25/2020- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3621728

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY, PLAINTIFF'S

2/23/2020- D6- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY, PLAINTIFF'S

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

2/23/2020- D5- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

2/23/2020- D4- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET) TO THE DEFENDANT

2/23/2020- D3- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET) TO THE DEFENDANT

COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S

2/23/2020- D1- COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S

COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF'S

2/23/2020- D2- COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF'S

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketEntered: 5/7/2020; > CANCEL REASON - DISMISSAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketEntered: 5/7/2020; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 7/9/2020 1:30:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/7/2020; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (PLAINTIFF'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 07/09/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; > CANCEL REASON - RESCHEDULING DUE TO COVID-19 OR BK19179 PG1359

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 4/9/2020 1:30:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/8/2020; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ROBYN CRAWFORD FOR PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 04/09/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3621728

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $0 - $100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY, PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET) TO THE DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Crawford, Robyn Kelli