This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 02/03/2021 at 17:15:18 (UTC).

WATERSIDE CHIROPRACTIC, INC. A/A/O ZACHARY BARFIELD VS ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/26/2020 WATERSIDE CHIROPRACTIC, INC A/A/O ZACHARY BARFIELD filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HIGBEE, RONALD P.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HIGBEE, RONALD P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WATERSIDE CHIROPRACTIC, INC. A/A/O ZACHARY BARFIELD

8551 W Sunrise Blvd Suite 203

Plantation, FL 33322

Defendant

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

8333 Bryan Dairy Road

Largo, FL 33777

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Greene, Travis

300 Se 17Th St

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33316-2550

Defendant Attorney

Parrino, Anthony Joseph

8950 Dr Martin Luther King Jr St N Ste 220

Saint Petersburg, FL 33702-3001

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES - DEFENDANT

1/15/2021- D19- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES - DEFENDANT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S)

1/15/2021- D18- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S)

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT'S) PLAINTIFF'S

1/15/2021- D17- RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT'S) PLAINTIFF'S

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES -PLAINTIFF

12/15/2020- D11- REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES -PLAINTIFF

MOTION TO STRIKE (PLAINTIFF'S) AND/OR FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT REGARDING DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/15/2020- D10- MOTION TO STRIKE (PLAINTIFF'S) AND/OR FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT REGARDING DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF FILING REQUEST OF DEPOSITIONS OF ADJUSTERS-PLAINTIFF'S

12/14/2020- D16- NOTICE OF FILING REQUEST OF DEPOSITIONS OF ADJUSTERS-PLAINTIFF'S

NOTICE OF FILING ADJUSTER CODE ETHICS-PLAINTIFF'S

12/14/2020- D15- NOTICE OF FILING ADJUSTER CODE ETHICS-PLAINTIFF'S

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADJUSTER CODE ETHICS-PLAINTIFF'S

12/14/2020- D14- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADJUSTER CODE ETHICS-PLAINTIFF'S

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT-PLAINTIFF'S

12/14/2020- D13- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT-PLAINTIFF'S

REQUEST TO PRODUCE -PLAINTIFF'S FIRST

12/14/2020- D12- REQUEST TO PRODUCE -PLAINTIFF'S FIRST

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

12/6/2020- D9- ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ANTHONY PARRINO FOR ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

12/3/2020- D8- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ANTHONY PARRINO FOR ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ELECTRONIC DELIVERY ON 11/16/20 TO DONNA MOCH FOR ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

11/18/2020- D7- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ELECTRONIC DELIVERY ON 11/16/20 TO DONNA MOCH FOR ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS ISSUED ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

10/27/2020- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

10/26/2020- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

10/26/2020- D2- COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

10/26/2020- D1- COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3743196

10/27/2020- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3743196

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/19/2021; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES - DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/19/2021; RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/19/2021; RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT'S) PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/16/2020; REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES -PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/16/2020; MOTION TO STRIKE (PLAINTIFF'S) AND/OR FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT REGARDING DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/16/2020; NOTICE OF FILING REQUEST OF DEPOSITIONS OF ADJUSTERS-PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/16/2020; NOTICE OF FILING ADJUSTER CODE ETHICS-PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/16/2020; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADJUSTER CODE ETHICS-PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/16/2020; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT-PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/16/2020; REQUEST TO PRODUCE -PLAINTIFF'S FIRST

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/3/2020; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ANTHONY PARRINO FOR ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/20/2020; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ELECTRONIC DELIVERY ON 11/16/20 TO DONNA MOCH FOR ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS; Assessed : $55.00; Paid : $55.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3743196

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $0 - $100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2020; COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2020; COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WATERSIDE CHIROPRACTIC, INC. A/A/O SUE PEACE is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Greene, Travis